Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319483

EP1319483 - Drill with cylindrical head with hard metal cutters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/25]Drill with cylindrical head or similar tool with hard metal cutters
[2007/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.06.2008
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TIGRA Hartstoff GmbH
Gewerbering 2
86698 Oberndorf a. Lech / DE
[2003/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Feld, Harald, Dr.
Am Hasenbichl 19
86678 Ehingen / DE
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Gallo, Wolfgang , et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Buchenweg 17
86573 Obergriesbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Gallo, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) , et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Ludwigstrasse 26
86152 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date02027397.509.12.2002
[2003/25]
Priority number, dateDE200116182315.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10161823
[2003/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1319483
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1319483
Date:02.02.2005
[2005/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1319483
Date:08.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:B27G15/00, B23B51/00
[2005/05]
Former International [2003/25]B27G15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/25]
TitleGerman:Zylinderkopfbohrer mit Hartmetallschneiden[2007/17]
English:Drill with cylindrical head with hard metal cutters[2007/17]
French:Mèche avec tête cylindrique avec éléments de coupe en métal dur[2007/17]
Former [2003/25]Zylinderkopfbohrer oder ähnliches Werkzeug mit Hartmetallschneiden
Former [2003/25]Drill with cylindrical head or similar tool with hard metal cutters
Former [2003/25]Mèche avec tête cylindrique ou outil similaire avec éléments de coupe en métal dur
Examination procedure12.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/28]
24.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2007Fee for grant paid
19.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY08.08.2007
CZ08.08.2007
EE08.08.2007
FI08.08.2007
GB08.08.2007
IE08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
SI08.08.2007
SK08.08.2007
TR08.08.2007
BG08.11.2007
SE08.11.2007
GR09.11.2007
BE31.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/33]CY08.08.2007
CZ08.08.2007
EE08.08.2007
FI08.08.2007
GB08.08.2007
IE08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
SI08.08.2007
SK08.08.2007
BG08.11.2007
SE08.11.2007
GR09.11.2007
BE31.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
Former [2009/29]CZ08.08.2007
EE08.08.2007
FI08.08.2007
GB08.08.2007
IE08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
SI08.08.2007
SK08.08.2007
BG08.11.2007
SE08.11.2007
GR09.11.2007
BE31.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
Former [2009/10]CZ08.08.2007
EE08.08.2007
FI08.08.2007
GB08.08.2007
IE08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
SK08.08.2007
BG08.11.2007
SE08.11.2007
GR09.11.2007
BE31.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
Former [2008/43]CZ08.08.2007
FI08.08.2007
GB08.08.2007
IE08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
SK08.08.2007
BG08.11.2007
SE08.11.2007
GR09.11.2007
BE31.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
Former [2008/33]CZ08.08.2007
FI08.08.2007
GB08.08.2007
IE08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
SK08.08.2007
BG08.11.2007
SE08.11.2007
GR09.11.2007
MC31.12.2007
Former [2008/28]CZ08.08.2007
FI08.08.2007
GB08.08.2007
IE08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
SK08.08.2007
BG08.11.2007
SE08.11.2007
GR09.11.2007
Former [2008/25]CZ08.08.2007
FI08.08.2007
GB08.08.2007
IE08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
SK08.08.2007
BG08.11.2007
GR09.11.2007
Former [2008/20]FI08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
BG08.11.2007
GR09.11.2007
Former [2008/10]FI08.08.2007
NL08.08.2007
BG08.11.2007
Former [2008/09]NL08.08.2007
BG08.11.2007
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1136209  (TIGRA HARTSTOFF GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * figure - *;
 [Y]EP0976492  (TIGRA HARTSTOFF GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]US1515548  (RUDOLF CEROTSKY) [Y] 3,4 * page 1, column R, line 92 - line 96; figures 5,7,9 *;
 [A]DE8808954U  (WEBER GUSTAV) [A] 1;
 [A]US5399051  (AKEN DOUGLAS G [US], et al)