Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321512

EP1321512 - Rinsing and cleaning composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.01.2006  [2006/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG
Rheinpromenade 1
40789 Monheim / DE
[2005/27]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Weuthen, Manfred, Dr.
Louveciennesstrasse 33
40764 Langenfeld / DE
02 / Elsner, Michael
Hülsbecker Platz 7
42579 Heiligenhaus / DE
 [2003/26]
Application number, filing date02027459.310.12.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateDE200116269619.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10162696
[2003/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1321512
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1321512
Date:17.09.2003
[2003/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:C11D1/83, C11D1/831, // C11D1/722, C11D1/14, C11D1/22
[2003/38]
Former International [2003/26]C11D1/83, // C11D1/722, C11D1/14, C11D1/22
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/26]
TitleGerman:Spül-und Reinigungsmittel[2003/26]
English:Rinsing and cleaning composition[2003/26]
French:Composition de rincage et nettoyage[2003/26]
Examination procedure10.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/26]
01.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/01]
08.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE10003752  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * page 2, lines 25-27; example -; claim -; table 1 *;
 [X]DE19962885  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * page 2, lines 57-64; example -; claim - *;
 [X]DE19962886  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * page 7, lines 39-41; claim - *;
 [XP]EP1229104  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-6 * claim - *;
 [XP]EP1167499  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-6 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]WO0148133  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]WO0148132  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * examples 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [X]WO0179401  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * examples 1-7 *