Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320244

EP1320244 - Modular Door Intercom System [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.2010Correction of patent specificationpublished on 26.01.2011  [2011/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GIRA GIERSIEPEN GmbH & Co. KG
Dahlienstrasse 12
D-42477 Radevormwald / DE
[2006/18]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
GIRA GIERSIEPEN GmbH. & CO. KG.
Dahlienstrasse 12
D-42477 Radevormwald / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dornseiff, Andre
Maria-Zanders-Strasse 11 b
42477 Hückeswagen / DE
02 / Steinmetzler, Andreas
Hof Güldenwerth 20
42857 Remscheid / DE
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Schlossbleiche 20
42103 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Schlossbleiche 20
D-42103 Wuppertal / DE
Former [2003/25]Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Schlossbleiche 20
42103 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date02027577.210.12.2002
[2003/25]
Priority number, dateDE200116081311.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10160813
[2003/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320244
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1320244
Date:03.05.2006
Language:DE
[2006/18]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1320244
Date:03.03.2010
Language:DE
[2010/09]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1320244
Date:26.01.2011
[N/P]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/02, H04M9/02
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/25]
TitleGerman:Modulare Hauskommunikationsanlage[2003/25]
English:Modular Door Intercom System[2003/25]
French:Système d'interphone modulaire[2005/52]
Former [2003/25]Systeme d'interphone modulaire
Examination procedure08.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/02]
02.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2005Date of oral proceedings
10.11.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2006Fee for grant paid
09.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06101412.2  / EP1677492
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.01.2007  08.02.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Ritto GmbH & Co.KG
Rodenbacher Strasse 15
35708 Haiger / DE
Opponent's representative
Fleck, Hermann-Josef
Jeck & Fleck
Patentanwälte
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2007/10]
Opponent(s)     
deleted
16.03.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.09.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.09.2007Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M10)
07.07.2008Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
29.01.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.05.2009Date of oral proceedings
28.05.2009Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.05.2009Date of oral proceedings
17.07.2009Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.07.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.11.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
15.01.2010Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.05.2006
EE03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
IE03.05.2006
BG03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
LU10.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]EE03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
IE03.05.2006
BG03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
LU10.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/31]EE03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
IE03.05.2006
BG03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/28]EE03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
IE03.05.2006
GR04.08.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/20]FI03.05.2006
IE03.05.2006
GR04.08.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/45]FI03.05.2006
IE03.05.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/38]FI03.05.2006
IE03.05.2006
IT03.05.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/12]FI03.05.2006
IE03.05.2006
Former [2006/52]FI03.05.2006
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE19836457  (LOH KG RITTO WERK [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 3 - line 25 * * column 1, line 59 - line 65 * * column 2, line 44 - line 56 * * column 3, line 16 - line 24 *;
 [DY]DE19548744  (TUERCONTROLSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [DY] 1-14 * figure 1 * * figure 3 * * column 1, line 3 - line 5 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 23 * * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 19 * * column 5, line 63 - line 68 * * column 6, line 48 - line 53 *;
 [A]EP1135013  (GROTHE & SOEHNE GMBH & CO KG A [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 16 * * column 4, line 40 - line 56 * * column 5, line 10 - column 6, line 6 * * column 11, line 40 - line 47 * * column 13, line 37 - column 14, line 17 *
OppositionDE19710535
    - JUNG, Jung-Technisches Handbuch '99,