Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319990

EP1319990 - Charge control resin particles and toner for developing electrostatic images [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2007
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ORIENT CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
7-14, Shinmori 1-chome, Asahi-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
[2006/23]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
ORIENT CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
7-14, Shinmori 1-chome, Asahi-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Isoda, Akihide, Orient Chemical Ind., Ltd.
8-1, Sanrahigashimachi
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Kihara, Tetssuji, Orient Chemical Ind., Ltd.
8-1, Sanrahigashimachi
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka / JP
03 / Tsuruhara, Tohru, Orient Chemical Ind., Ltd.
8-1, Sanrahigashimachi
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka / JP
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Liedl, Christine , et al
Hansmann & Vogeser
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Liedl, Christine , et al
c/o Hansmann & Vogeser, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
Application number, filing date02027585.510.12.2002
[2003/25]
Priority number, dateJP2001038062113.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001380621
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1319990
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1319990
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:G03G9/097
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2004/11]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Harzteilchen für Ladungssteuerung und Toner für die Entwicklung elektrostatischer Bilder[2003/25]
English:Charge control resin particles and toner for developing electrostatic images[2003/25]
French:Particules de résine pour controle de charge et révélateurs pour le développement d' images électrostatiques[2003/25]
Examination procedure03.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/45]
19.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2006Fee for grant paid
28.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1061420  (CHUKYO YUSHI CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,9 * examples 1,6; claims 1-22 *;
 [A]US5827631  (YOSHIHARA KOUTAROU [JP], et al) [A] 9 * examples 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4762763  (NOMURA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 9 * examples 1,5; claim 1 *