Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321733

EP1321733 - Liquid-air heat exchanger, more particularly heat exchanger for automotive vehicle and process for manufacturing such a heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.11.2007
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.12.2007  [2007/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valeo Termico S.A.
Carretera de Logrono km 8,9 Apartado de Correos no. 615
50011 Zaragoza / ES
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Valeo Termico S.A.
Carretera de Logrono km 8,9 Apartado de Correos no. 615
50011 Zaragoza / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Laborda, Fernando
Carretera de Logrono km 8,9
50011 Zaragoza / ES
02 / Correas, Luis Carlos
Conde de Aranda, 19
50011 Zaragoza / ES
03 / Perrin, Patrick
9, rue Roulotte
Pluvault 21110 Genlis / FR
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Rolland, Jean-Christophe
Valeo Systèmes Thermiques
8 Rue Louis Lormand
BP 517 - La Verrière
78321 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Rolland, Jean-Christophe
Valeo Thermique Moteur, Propriété Industrielle, 8, rue Louis-Lormand
78321 La Verrière / FR
Application number, filing date02027849.512.12.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateES2001000288614.12.2001         Original published format: ES 200102886
[2003/26]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1321733
Date:25.06.2003
Language:FR
[2003/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1321733
Date:17.05.2006
[2006/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2006
ClassificationInternational:F28D1/03, F28F3/14, F02M31/20
[2006/20]
Former International [2003/26]F28D1/03, F28F3/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/26]
TitleGerman:Wasser-Luft-Wärmetauscher, insbesondere Wärmetauscher für ein Kraftfahrzeug und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen Wärmetauschers[2003/26]
English:Liquid-air heat exchanger, more particularly heat exchanger for automotive vehicle and process for manufacturing such a heat exchanger[2003/26]
French:Echangeur de chaleur liquide-air, plus particulièrement pour véhicule automobile, et procédé de fabrication d' un tel échangeur[2003/26]
Examination procedure06.11.2006Examination requested  [2007/06]
20.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/52]
08.08.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
16.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4700445  (RASKIN RUBIN [US]) [X] 1,2,6,17,18 * figures 3,7 * [Y] 10-15,19,20;
 [Y]JPS5689343  ;
 [Y]FR2774463  (PEUGEOT [FR]) [Y] 10-15 * abstract *;
 [X]WO0114080  (ROTH MAX [CH]) [X] 1-9 * page 7, line 12 - page 8, line 12 * * page 11, line 31 - line 33; figures 2-5 *;
 [X]DE29914630U  (EKO STAHL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9 * figures 1,3; claims 1,3 *;
 [X]DE2604879  (GERHARD & RAUH) [X] 1,2,6 * figures 1-3; claims 1,4 *;
 [A]EP1040882  (STULZ GMBH KLIMATECHNIK [DE]) [A] 19 * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0018] *;
 [A]US6164368  (FURUKAWA YUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 19 * column 6, line 55 - line 60; figures 11,12 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 4 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811017), vol. 005, no. 162, Database accession no. (M - 092), [Y] 19,20 * abstract *