Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321072

EP1321072 - Component to construct a rack, furniture, a column or similar [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.05.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VEYHL GmbH
D-75389 Neuweiler-Zwerenberg / DE
[2003/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Van Muylders, Bart
Arthur Mathijslaan 50
2140 Antwerpen / BE
02 / Dürr, Markus
Schulstrasse 13
72141 Walddorfhäslach / DE
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]Kohler Schmid Möbus
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2003/26]KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER
Patentanwälte GbR, Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date02027890.913.12.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateDE2001220498U19.12.2001         Original published format: DE 20120498 U
[2003/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1321072
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A47B96/14
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/26]
TitleGerman:Element zum Aufbau eines Gestells, eines Möbels, einer Säule oder dergleichen[2003/26]
English:Component to construct a rack, furniture, a column or similar[2003/26]
French:Elément pour construire un casier, un meuble, une colonne ou similaire[2003/26]
Examination procedure18.10.2003Examination requested  [2004/16]
18.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/27]
04.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/27]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]GB1059220  (KOOPERATIVA FOERBUNDET) [X] 1-9,11 * page 1, column 2, line 58 - line 75; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]DE2917480  (HOLZAEPFEL CHRISTIAN GMBH) [X] 1-4,6-9 * page 6, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 2; figures 1-5 * * page 7, paragraph 5 *;
 [X]DE29904041U  (SANIPA GMBH BADEINRICHTUNGEN [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7-9 * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 8; figures 6-9 *;
 [A]GB916961  (ETS DENNERY SOC D) [A] 5 * figure 1; claim 1 *