EP1322088 - Method and apparatus for centralized processing of hardware tokens for PKI solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US | [2011/14] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US | ||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067-2177 / US | ||
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states TRW INC. One Space Park E2/6077 Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aull, Kenneth W. 5364 Lake Normandy Court Fairfax, Virginia 22030 / US | 02 /
Kerr, Thomas C. 5348 Black Oak Drive Fairfax, Virginia 22032 / US | 03 /
Freeman, William E. 5222 DeWitt Road Arbutus, Maryland 21227 / US | 04 /
Bellmore, Mark A. 14916 Chelsea Circle Mt. Airy, Maryland 21227 / US | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02028074.9 | 17.12.2002 | [2003/26] | Priority number, date | US20010027563 | 19.12.2001 Original published format: US 27563 | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1322088 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1322088 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F1/00, G07F7/10, H04L9/32, H04L9/30 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
G06Q20/38215 (EP,US);
H04L9/006 (EP,US);
H04L9/0897 (EP,US);
H04L9/3234 (EP,US);
H04L9/3263 (EP,US);
H04L2463/102 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/26] | H04L29/06, G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/34] |
Former [2003/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur zentralisierten Verarbeitung von Hardware-Tokens für PKI | [2003/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for centralized processing of hardware tokens for PKI solutions | [2003/26] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement centralisé de jetons materiels pour l'infrastructure a clé publique | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 27.05.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 23.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - BIGET P ET AL, "How smart cards can benefit from object-oriented technologies", FUTURE GENERATIONS COMPUTER SYSTEMS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970701), vol. 13, no. 1, ISSN 0167-739X, pages 75 - 90, XP004081711 [X] 1-24 * page 77, paragraph 1.2.3 - page 82, paragraph 2.2.2 * * page 85, paragraph 3 - page 87, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-739X(97)00010-1 | [PX] - "Installation and user Guide version 3.2", GEMSAFE LIBRARIES FOR WINDOWS, (20020731), URL: www.study24.org/pdf/software/gemsafe-lib-user.pdf, (20030801), XP002250119 [PX] 1-24 * pages 5-10 * * page 23 - page 33 * | [A] - M'RAHI D ET AL, "E-commerce applications of smart cards", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010716), vol. 36, no. 4, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 453 - 472, XP004304909 [A] 1-24 * page 460, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(01)00166-9 | Examination | WO0131841 | EP1162778 | EP1162781 | - KENNETH W AULL ET AL, "A practical public key infrastructure - TRW's Entreprise Directory and security services", (20001101), pages 89 - 106, XP055308513 |