Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321532

EP1321532 - Reagent for improved PCR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.09.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.10.2006  [2006/40]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  LI  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  SI  SK  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  LI  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  SI  SK  TR 
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Heindl, Dieter, Dr.
Waldschmidtstrasse 1
82327 Tutzing / DE
02 / Birkner, Christian, Dr.
Willingstrasse 9
82449 Uffing / DE
03 / von der Eltz, Herbert, Dr.
In der Au 21
82362 Weilheim / DE
 [2003/26]
Application number, filing date02028282.817.12.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateEP2001013025219.12.2001         Original published format: EP 01130252
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1321532
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/26]
TitleGerman:Reagenz zur verbesserter PCR[2003/26]
English:Reagent for improved PCR[2003/26]
French:Réactif pour PCR amélioré[2003/26]
Examination procedure29.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
25.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
03.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/40]
20.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1026261  (ORTHO CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 10 - line 28 * * page 3, line 45 - line 50 * * page 4, line 43 - page 5, line 25 *;
 [X]  GONZALEZ R G ET AL, "FRACTIONATION AND STRUCTURAL ELUCIDATION OF THE ACTIVE COMPONENTS OF AURINTRICARBOXYLIC-ACID A POTENT INHIBITOR OF PROTEIN NUCLEIC-ACID INTERACTIONS", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, EN, (1979), vol. 562, no. 3, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 534 - 546, XP008004646 [X] 7,8 * Abstract *
 [X]  NAKANE H ET AL, "DIFFERENTIAL INHIBITION OF VARIOUS DNA POLYMERASES BY EVANS BLUE AND AURINTRICARBOXYLIC ACID", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 177, no. 1, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 91 - 96, XP008004638 [X] 7,8 * Abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1988.tb14348.x
 [X]  BABA M ET AL, "FUCHSIN ACID SELECTIVELY INHIBITS HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS HIV REPLICATION IN-VITRO", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1988), vol. 155, no. 3, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 1404 - 1411, XP002202177 [X] 7,8 * Abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(88)81297-X
 [AD]  CUSHMAN MARK ET AL, "Structural investigation and anti-HIV activities of high molecular weight ATA polymers.", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 57, no. 26, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 7241 - 7248, XP002202179 [AD] 1-8 * compound 3 (A-12) *; page 7241 * * page 7246, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 1; figure 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00052a045
 [A]  CUSHMAN M ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF THE COVALENT HYDRATE OF THE INCORRECTLY ASSUMED STRUCTURE OF AURINTRICARBOXYLIC ACID ATA", TETRAHEDRON, (1990), vol. 46, no. 5, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 1491 - 1498, XP002202178 [A] 1-8 * Introduction, Compounds 1 and 2, Discussion *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)81957-8
 [A]  WANG P ET AL, "ISOLATION OF STRUCTURE ELUCIDATION OF LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT COMPONENTS OF AURINTRICARBOXYLIC ACID ATA", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 57, no. 14, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 3861 - 3866, XP002202180 [A] 1-8 * compounds 9 and 10 (A-12) *; page 3861 * * page 3865, column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00040a027
 [AD]  KAINZ PETER ET AL, "Specificity-enhanced hot-start PCR: Addition of double-stranded DNA fragments adapted to the annealing temperature.", BIOTECHNIQUES, (200002), vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 278 - 282, XP002202181 [AD] 1-8 * page 278, column 2, line 2 * * page 282, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 4 *