Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321200

EP1321200 - Sheet metal working machine with a tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/26]Tool in sheet metal working machine
[2007/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.01.2009
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 24.11.2010  [2010/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHIAVI MACCHINE INDUSTRIALI S.p.A.
Via Borromei, 11
20123 Milano / IT
[2008/03]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
SCHIAVI MACCHINE INDUSTRIALI S.p.A.
Via P. Giannone, 9
20154 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Mezzadri, Luigi
Via Fratelli Orio, 12
29100 Piacenza / IT
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Guareschi, Antonella
Ing. Dallaglio S.r.l. Via Mazzini 2
43121 Parma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Guareschi, Antonella
Ing. Dallaglio S.r.l. Viale Mentana 92/C
43100 Parma / IT
Former [2004/40]Guareschi, Antonella
Studio Ing. Fabrizio Dallaglio, 92/C, Viale Mentana
43100 Parma / IT
Former [2003/26]Gotra, Stefano
Bugnion S.p.A. Via Garibaldi 22
43100 Parma / IT
Application number, filing date02028321.417.12.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateIT2001PR0009321.12.2001         Original published format: IT PR20010093
[2003/26]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1321200
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1321200
Date:22.10.2003
[2003/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1321200
Date:26.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:B21D5/02
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/42]
Former [2004/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
Former [2004/29](deleted) 
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Blechbearbeitungsmaschine mit einem Werkzeug[2007/48]
English:Sheet metal working machine with a tool[2007/48]
French:Machine à travailler la tôle avec un outil[2007/48]
Former [2003/26]Werkzeug in ein Blechbearbeitungsmaschine
Former [2003/26]Tool in sheet metal working machine
Former [2003/26]Outil dans une machine à travailler la tôle
Examination procedure12.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/37]
12.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2008Fee for grant paid
12.02.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.06.2004AT   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004BE   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004BG   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004CH   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004CY   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004CZ   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004DE   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004DK   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004EE   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004ES   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004FI   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004FR   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004GB   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004GR   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004IE   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004IT   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004LU   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004MC   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004NL   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004PT   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004SE   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004SI   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004SK   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
14.06.2004TR   M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
14.06.2004M01   Fee paid on   12.07.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CY26.03.2008
CZ26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
EE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SI26.03.2008
SK26.03.2008
TR26.03.2008
BG26.06.2008
SE26.06.2008
GR27.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
GB17.12.2008
IE17.12.2008
LU17.12.2008
[2010/47]
Former [2010/37]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CY26.03.2008
CZ26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
EE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SI26.03.2008
SK26.03.2008
TR26.03.2008
BG26.06.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
GB17.12.2008
IE17.12.2008
LU17.12.2008
Former [2010/32]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CY26.03.2008
CZ26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
EE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SI26.03.2008
SK26.03.2008
BG26.06.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
GB17.12.2008
IE17.12.2008
LU17.12.2008
Former [2010/01]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CY26.03.2008
CZ26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
EE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SI26.03.2008
SK26.03.2008
BG26.06.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
GB17.12.2008
IE17.12.2008
Former [2009/47]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CY26.03.2008
CZ26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
EE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SI26.03.2008
SK26.03.2008
BG26.06.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
IE17.12.2008
Former [2009/42]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CY26.03.2008
CZ26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
EE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SI26.03.2008
SK26.03.2008
BG26.06.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
Former [2009/23]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CZ26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
EE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SI26.03.2008
SK26.03.2008
BG26.06.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
Former [2009/22]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CZ26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
EE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SI26.03.2008
SK26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
DE27.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
Former [2009/12]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CZ26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SI26.03.2008
SK26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
DE27.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
Former [2009/08]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CZ26.03.2008
DK26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SI26.03.2008
SK26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
Former [2009/01]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CZ26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
NL26.03.2008
SI26.03.2008
SK26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
Former [2008/49]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
CZ26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
SI26.03.2008
SK26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
PT01.09.2008
Former [2008/46]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
SI26.03.2008
SE26.06.2008
Former [2008/44]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
SI26.03.2008
Former [2008/43]AT26.03.2008
BE26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
Former [2008/39]AT26.03.2008
FI26.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2791590  (BRISARD MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1,2,10 * page 4, line 27 - page 6, line 15 *;
 [A]JPH09220618  ;
 [A]US3782166  (WHISTLER L, et al) [A] 1,2,10 * column W *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, [A] 1,2,10 * abstract *