Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1323382

EP1323382 - Sheath with devices for endoscopic blood vessel harvesting [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
For all designated states
Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
For all designated states
TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2004/09]For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
For all designated states
TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2003/27]For all designated states
Olympus Optical Co., Ltd.
43-2, Hatagaya 2-Chome, Shibuya-Ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kasahara, Hideyuki, Olympus Optical Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department, 2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Kogasaka, Takahiro, Olympus Optical Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department, 2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
 [2008/38]
Former [2003/27]01 / Kasahara, Hideyuki, Olympus Optical Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department,2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Kogasaka, Takahiro, Olympus Optical Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department,2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/27]von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date02028642.320.12.2002
[2003/27]
Priority number, dateJP2001039846427.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001398464
JP2001040193828.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001401938
[2003/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1323382
Date:02.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1323382
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/00
[2003/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/27]
TitleGerman:Ummantelung mit Geräten für das endoskopische Gewinnen von Blutgefässen[2003/27]
English:Sheath with devices for endoscopic blood vessel harvesting[2003/27]
French:Gaine avec des dispositifs de prélèvement de vaisseaux sanguins[2003/27]
Examination procedure28.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/05]
11.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2008Fee for grant paid
10.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08022270.6  / EP2047806
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
18.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2010/47]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/08]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/50]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/49]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/46]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
Former [2009/43]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/37]FI25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/36]FI25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]US5913870  (DEFONZO STEPHAN A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7-9,14 * column 9, line 9 - line 15; figure 15 * * column 10, line 58 - line 61 *;
 [X]US5373840  (KNIGHTON DAVID R [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,14 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US5913866  (GINN RICHARD S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,14 * column 7, line 13 - line 16 *;
 [X]WO9726831  (ORIGIN MEDSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7-9,14 * page 8, line 31 - line 34 * * figures 9A,9B *;
 [DX]WO0040160  (ORIGIN MEDSYSTEMS INC [US]) [DX] 12 * figures 3B,3C,8A *