Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1323529 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 871
10.04.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
06.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.03.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 22
31.03.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
31.03.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
26.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
26.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
26.09.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 18
26.09.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.09.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.09.2016 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
26.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.08.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
23.08.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
23.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 2
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 3
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 3
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 3
18.08.2016 Claims Appeal 2
17.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
17.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
18.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.06.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
07.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.05.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
31.05.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
31.05.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 11
23.05.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
23.10.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
07.04.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
20.03.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.03.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 4
08.11.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.10.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
24.10.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 40
02.09.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
26.08.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
21.08.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
21.08.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
09.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.06.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
27.06.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
27.06.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
27.06.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.06.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.06.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
14.06.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
10.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
10.06.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2013 Claims Opposition 3
13.05.2013 Claims Opposition 3
13.05.2013 Claims Opposition 2
13.05.2013 Claims Opposition 2
13.05.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 21
23.04.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
05.03.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.02.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
11.02.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
11.02.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.02.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2012 Claims Opposition 2
21.03.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 39
01.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
01.02.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.01.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.09.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
23.09.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
25.08.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
17.08.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
17.08.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.08.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
21.10.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.10.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.10.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
06.10.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
06.10.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.06.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
04.06.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
04.06.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.06.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 31
16.02.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.02.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
16.02.2010 Description Search / examination 4
16.02.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.02.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
13.10.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
13.10.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.01.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
11.01.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
11.01.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
11.01.2007 Description Search / examination 1
11.01.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.01.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 9
11.01.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.11.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.11.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.07.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
10.07.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.11.2004 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
18.08.2004 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
01.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
01.06.2004 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
21.04.2004 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
06.02.2004 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
07.07.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
21.05.2003 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
02.04.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
02.04.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.04.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
25.03.2003 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
18.03.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
18.03.2003 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
24.02.2003 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
24.02.2003 Translation of priority document Search / examination 38
24.02.2003 Translation of priority document Search / examination 38
20.12.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.12.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
20.12.2002 Description Search / examination 21
20.12.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.12.2002 Drawings Search / examination 8
20.12.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6