Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1308455 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1308455



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2049
20.01.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
07.01.2016 General enquiry Opposition 2
07.01.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
03.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.07.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
03.07.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
02.07.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.06.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.06.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.06.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.06.2015 Text: Decision / Communication Appeal 28
28.04.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 7
13.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.04.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.04.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
13.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.04.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.04.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 123
09.04.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
09.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.04.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
09.04.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
25.03.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
25.03.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
23.03.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
23.03.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
12.03.2015 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
20.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.2015 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
17.02.2015 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
13.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
13.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
13.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
13.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
13.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
13.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
13.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
13.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
13.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
13.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
13.02.2015 Claims Appeal 1
13.02.2015 Claims Appeal 1
13.02.2015 Claims Appeal 1
13.02.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 40
13.02.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
13.02.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.02.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
13.02.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
13.02.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
12.02.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
15.01.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
13.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Appeal 1
07.01.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
19.11.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.11.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
12.11.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.11.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 48
06.08.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.07.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.07.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.07.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.07.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.07.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
14.07.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.05.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
17.05.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.05.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.05.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.05.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.05.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 31
04.02.2014 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
16.01.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
16.01.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
13.01.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
13.01.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
11.01.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.01.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.01.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
02.01.2014 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 3
31.12.2013 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 3
28.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.12.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
19.12.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
19.12.2013 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
03.12.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.11.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
18.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.10.2013 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 3
16.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.10.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.10.2013 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
04.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.09.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
23.09.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
14.08.2013 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
14.08.2013 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
22.07.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
22.07.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 27
22.07.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
22.07.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
22.07.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.07.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
22.07.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
22.07.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
22.07.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
22.07.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 50
22.07.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 35
22.07.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
22.07.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.07.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.07.2013 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
09.05.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
12.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.04.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.04.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
05.10.2011 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
14.07.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.07.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.07.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
08.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 42
07.07.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.07.2011 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
05.07.2011 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
05.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
01.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.07.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
01.07.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
01.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
01.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 80
01.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
21.02.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.02.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
24.01.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.01.2011 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 2
30.12.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
09.12.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.12.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.12.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.10.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.10.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.10.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.10.2010 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 31
24.09.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
30.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2010 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
17.08.2010 Claims Opposition 1
17.08.2010 Claims Opposition 1
17.08.2010 Claims Opposition 1
17.08.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
17.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 55
17.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.08.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
13.08.2010 Annex Opposition 1
13.08.2010 Claims Opposition 3
13.08.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
13.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.08.2010 General authorisation Opposition 1
11.08.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 4
11.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 8
11.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 5
11.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 16
11.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 13
11.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.10.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
12.10.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.10.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.10.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.09.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.09.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.09.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.04.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.03.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.03.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.03.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.03.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 12
10.03.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.03.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.02.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.11.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
01.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
22.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
22.03.2008 Claims Opposition 2
22.03.2008 Claims Opposition 2
22.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
22.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
22.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
22.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
22.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
22.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
22.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
22.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
22.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
22.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
22.03.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.03.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
22.03.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 30
19.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
19.03.2008 Claims Opposition 2
19.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
19.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
19.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
19.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
19.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
19.03.2008 Claims Opposition 2
19.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
19.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
19.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
19.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
19.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
19.03.2008 Claims Opposition 1
19.03.2008 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
19.03.2008 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
19.03.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
19.03.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.03.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 30
09.01.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.2008 Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent Opposition 1
10.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
08.10.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.10.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
07.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
30.07.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.06.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.06.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.06.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
26.01.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
26.01.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.01.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.12.2006 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 20
20.12.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
20.12.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
20.12.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
20.12.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
20.12.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
20.12.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
20.12.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
20.12.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.12.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
20.12.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
20.12.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 49
20.12.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
20.12.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
20.12.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 127
20.12.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.06.2006 Communication concerning corrections of the European patent specification Search / examination 1
10.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
10.04.2006 Request for correction Search / examination 1
06.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
06.04.2006 Request for correction Search / examination 2
09.02.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.01.2006 Description Search / examination 2
17.01.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
17.01.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
17.01.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
13.01.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 7
06.12.2005 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 1
25.11.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
25.11.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.11.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
10.11.2005 Preparation of grant Search / examination 2
04.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 1
04.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.08.2005 Annex Search / examination 1
02.08.2005 Claims Search / examination 1
02.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.06.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.06.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.06.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.03.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.03.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.12.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
15.12.2004 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.12.2004 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.11.2004 Description Search / examination 9
23.11.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
18.11.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 14
24.09.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
17.09.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.07.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.06.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.03.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.03.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.03.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
04.06.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.05.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
16.04.2003 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
02.04.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
02.04.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.04.2003 European search report Search / examination 2
26.03.2003 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.03.2003 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
19.02.2003 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2003 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
19.02.2003 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
19.02.2003 Sequence listing Search / examination 3
10.02.2003 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 3
10.02.2003 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.12.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.12.2002 Annex Search / examination 3
27.12.2002 Annex Search / examination 1
27.12.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
27.12.2002 Description Search / examination 24
27.12.2002 Drawings Search / examination 7
27.12.2002 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
27.12.2002 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.12.2002 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7
24.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 62