Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1308455

EP1308455 - A composition comprising anti-HER2 antibodies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  18.09.2015
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2016Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 10.02.2016  [2016/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/12]For all designated states
GENENTECH, INC.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
Former [2003/19]For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Basey, Carol D.
319 Hillview Lane
Winters, CA 95694 / US
02 / Blank, Greg S.
1320 Hobart Street
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
 [2003/19]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/24]Jaenichen, Hans-Rainer , et al
Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2003/19]Kremer, Simon Mark , et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date02029008.603.05.1999
[2003/19]
Priority number, dateUS19980084459P06.05.1998         Original published format: US 84459 P
[2003/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1308455
Date:07.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1308455
Date:14.05.2003
[2003/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1308455
Date:22.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/12]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1308455
Date:14.06.2006
[2006/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:C07K1/18, C07K16/32
[2003/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/19]
Extension statesAL13.01.2003
LT13.01.2003
LV13.01.2003
MK13.01.2003
RO13.01.2003
SI13.01.2003
TitleGerman:Anti-HER2 Antikörperzusammensetzung[2003/19]
English:A composition comprising anti-HER2 antibodies[2003/19]
French:Composition d'anticorps anti-HER2[2003/19]
Examination procedure10.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/46]
12.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
18.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2006Fee for grant paid
13.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99921610.4  / EP1075488
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.12.2006  04.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
PO Box 18558
2502 EN The Hague / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2011/32]
Opponent(s)01  20.12.2006  04.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma PO Box 18558
2502 EN The Hague / NL
Former [2010/39]
Opponent(s)01  20.12.2006  04.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Bird & Bird LLP Van Alkemadelaan 700
2597 AW Den Haag / NL
Former [2007/06]
Opponent(s)01  20.12.2006  04.01.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/43]
26.01.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.03.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.09.2010Date of oral proceedings
05.10.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.10.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
16.04.2015Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2015/43]
16.04.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/33]
29.06.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition09.12.2010Appeal received No.  T2522/10
15.02.2011Statement of grounds filed
16.04.2015Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form
28.01.2014Date of oral proceedings
04.02.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
16.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
28.04.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
13.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
13.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB16.05.2014
[2016/06]
Former [2015/47]CH22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
GB16.05.2014
Former [2015/09]GB16.05.2014
Former [2007/45]deleted
Former [2007/38]IT22.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9222653  (GENENTECH INC [US]) [X] 1-5,8,9 * pages 32-38 * * page 52, paragraph L * [Y] 1-9;
 [XY]WO9633208  (GENENTECH INC [US]) [X] 1-5,8,9 * page 12 - page 13 * [Y] 1-9;
 [Y]  MOORHOUSE K G ET AL, "Validation of an HPLC method for the analysis of the charge heterogeneity of the recombinant monoclonal antibody IDEC-C2B8 after papain digestion.", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL AND BIOMEDICAL ANALYSIS. ENGLAND DEC 1997, (199712), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 0731-7085, pages 593 - 603, XP002232225 [Y] 1-9 * page 594 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0731-7085(97)00178-7
 [Y]  TSAI P K ET AL, "Origin of the isoelectric heterogeneity of monoclonal immunoglobulin h1B4.", DATABASE MEDLINE, Database accession no. NLM7904750, XP002232226 [Y] 1-9 * abstract *
    [] PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH. UNITED STATES NOV 1993, (199311), vol. 10, no. 11, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 1580 - 1586,
 [Y]  ADACHI T ET AL, "Ion-exchange high-performance liquid chromatographic separation of protein variants and isoforms on MCI GEL ProtEx stationary phases", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NL, (19970228), vol. 763, no. 1-2, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 57 - 63, XP004116727 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(96)01012-6