Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237353

EP1237353 - An image sensor having black pixels disposed in a spaced-apart relationship from the active pixels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.12.2013
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.01.2014  [2014/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OmniVision Technologies, Inc.
4275 Burton Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2011/36]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / McDermott, Bruce Crane
c/o Eastman Kodak Company, PTS, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Moberg, Gregory Oscar
c/o Eastman Kodak Company, PTS, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Hackney, Nigel John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/21]Hackney, Nigel John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2009/09]Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2002/49]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2002/36]Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe , et al
Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date02075345.528.01.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateUS20010267849P09.02.2001         Original published format: US 267849 P
US2001095384617.09.2001         Original published format: US 953846
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1237353
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/401, H04N5/217, H04N3/15
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/21]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bildsensor mit schwarzen Pixeln, die räumlich verteilt zu den aktiven Bildpunkten angeordnet sind[2002/36]
English:An image sensor having black pixels disposed in a spaced-apart relationship from the active pixels[2002/36]
French:Capteur d'image avec pixels noirs disposés en relation spatiale distante des pixels actifs[2002/36]
Examination procedure08.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/02]
31.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/03]
09.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/03]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2003
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
05.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
08.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
07.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
07.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
06.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201312   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0541332  (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,8 * abstract * * column 3, lines 29-36 * * column 3, lines 15-18 *;
 [X]US5521639  (TOMURA MASAHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,8 * abstract *
by applicantEP0541332
 US5521639