Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256914

EP1256914 - Method and apparatus for automatic bulk vending [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.03.2004  [2004/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mars Incorporated
6885 Elm Street McLean
Virginia 22101-3883 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
Mars Incorporated
6885 Elm Street
McLean, Virginia 22101-3883 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Picioccio, John J
247 Glenwild Avenue
Bloomingdale, NJ 07403 / US
02 / Kienitz, Steven D
25 Rose Lane
Sparta, NJ 07871 / US
03 / Kitchen, Warren R
1901 Washington Blvd, Apt. C2 South
Easton, PA 18042 / US
04 / Rossi, Joseph E.
490 Wasburn avenue
Washington, NJ 07882 / US
05 / Haase, William C
7 Rosalyn Drive
Long valley, NJ 07863 / US
06 / Ono, Allison T
P.O Box 138
Great Meadows, NJ 07838 / US
07 / Hinkle, Wayne R.
719 Pen Argyl Street
Pen Argyl, PA 18072 / US
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Musker, David Charles , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Musker, David Charles , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date02075352.108.05.1996
[2002/46]
Priority number, dateUS1995043663408.05.1995         Original published format: US 436634
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1256914
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:G07F13/06, G07F13/02, G07F11/44, A47F5/13
[2002/46]
Designated contracting states[2003/31]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum automatischen Verkauf von unverpackten Produkten[2002/46]
English:Method and apparatus for automatic bulk vending[2002/46]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la vente en vrac automatique[2002/46]
Examination procedure14.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/14]
09.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/14]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96915611.6  / EP0830311
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
20.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.06.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
27.06.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
27.06.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200308   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4852621  (BEAR DON E [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 2, line 33 - line 39 * * column 6, line 3 - line 42 * * figure 2A *;
 [A]FR1443887  (BLANCHON PATRICK E) [A] 1-3,6,7 * page 1, column R, line 12 - line 17 * * page 2, column R, line 7 - line 17 * * page 3, column R, line 18 - line 49 * * page 4, column L, line 42 - page 5, column L, line 20 * * figure - *;
 [A]FR2489266  (AVIAS ROBERT [FR]) [A] 3-5 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 26; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0434168  (GIROLAMO SILVESTRO DI [IT]) [A] 4,5 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 24 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US4815633  (KONDO RYOHEI [JP], et al) [A] 8-10 * column 1, line 41 - column 4, line 18 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 23 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2631802  (GENDRE JEAN PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 8 * abstract * * page 2, line 35 - page 4, line 17 * * figures 1,2,4 *;
 [A]FR2491031  (GIDECO [FR]) [A] 8 * page 5, line 18 - page 7, line 11 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS61177947
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861226), vol. 010, no. 390, Database accession no. (C - 394), [A] 8 * abstract *