Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239012

EP1239012 - Ink jet printing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.05.2005
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Erdtmann, David, c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Evans, Steven, c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Lopez, Edgardo, c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
04 / Van Hanehem, Richard C., c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2002/37]Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe , et al
Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date02075601.114.02.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateUS2001079460427.02.2001         Original published format: US 794604
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1239012
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1239012
Date:05.11.2003
[2003/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/00, B41M5/00
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/31]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahl-Druckverfahren[2002/37]
English:Ink jet printing method[2002/37]
French:Procédé d' impression par jet d' encre[2002/37]
Examination procedure05.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/24]
11.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/25]
25.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5997622  (WEBER HELMUT [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 14 - column 11, line 4 *;
 [Y]US5062892  (HALKO DAVID J [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, lines 60-66 * * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 36 * * examples 1,7 *;
 [Y]US6013123  (SCARPETTI JULIUS J [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, lines 51-63 * * column 11, lines 49-65 * * column 12, lines 61-64 * * column 13, lines 6-25 *;
 [Y]US6183548  (ERDTMANN DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 37 - column 5, line 52 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 10 *;
 [Y]US5281263  (GREGORY PETER [GB], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 22 * * column 4, lines 33-44 *;
 [Y]US5374301  (GREGORY PETER [GB], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 24 * * column 6, lines 37-50 * * example 1 *;
 [DA]US4420550  (EVANS STEVEN [US], et al)