Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1241396

EP1241396 - Supporting construction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.12.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.02.2006  [2006/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vogel's Holding B.V.
Hondsruglaan 93
5628 DB Eindhoven / NL
[2002/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Obdeijn, Rudolf Franciscus Andreas
Zandhaai 10
5658 BA Eindhoven / NL
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Dohmen, Johannes Maria Gerardus , et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Dohmen, Johannes Maria Gerardus , et al
Algemeen Octrooibureau, P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date02075642.518.02.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateNL2001101760214.03.2001         Original published format: NL 1017602
[2002/38]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1241396
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16M11/12, H04R1/02
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
TitleGerman:Tragvorrichtung[2002/38]
English:Supporting construction[2002/38]
French:Structure de support[2002/38]
Examination procedure12.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
31.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/07]
14.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AD]FR2749618  (ATRAL [FR]) [AD] 1 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 31; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4247069  (KURZ GERD) [A] 1 * column 4, line 14 - line 25; figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]US5730409  (BARON ALLEN S [US], et al);
 [A]US4836485  (COOPER GERSHON [US])
by applicantUS5730409
 US2749618