Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238624

EP1238624 - Intra-oral camera with integral display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2007
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2006/17]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Spoonhower, John P., c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Squilla, John R., c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Boland, John T., c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2002/37]Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe , et al
Kodak Limited, Patent Department (W92)-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date02075645.818.02.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateUS2001079623928.02.2001         Original published format: US 796239
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238624
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1238624
Date:10.12.2003
[2003/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238624
Date:26.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/24
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/36]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Intraorale Kamera mit integralem Display[2002/37]
English:Intra-oral camera with integral display[2002/37]
French:Caméra intraorale avec afficheur intégral[2002/37]
Examination procedure18.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/29]
18.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2006Fee for grant paid
01.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6190309  (OOSHIMA KIYOKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 4, line 3 - line 52 * * column 7, line 27 - line 63 * [Y] 12;
 [XY]US6106457  (PERKINS DAVID G [US], et al) [X] 13-18 * column 10, line 24 - column 11, line 49 * * column 13, line 50 - column 14, line 64 * * column 20, line 30 - column 23, line 10 * * column 32, line 23 - line 28 * [Y] 12;
 [AD]US6132211  (PEITHMAN KEITH C [US]) [AD] 1,2,12 * column 4, line 34 - line 60 * * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 6 *;
 [A]US5877819  (BRANSON PHILIP J [US]) [A] 1,7-11,14,15 * column 1, line 10 - line 14 * * column 9, line 43 - line 49 * * column 17, line 8 - line 10 * * column 38, line 10 - line 48 *
by applicantUS6132211