Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238815

EP1238815 - Ink jet recording element and printing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.01.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Shaw-Klein, Lori J., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Bermel, Alexandra D., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Martin, Colin, Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2002/37]Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe
Kodak Limited, Patent Department (W92)-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date02075736.522.02.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateUS2001079993306.03.2001         Original published format: US 799933
US2001079993206.03.2001         Original published format: US 799932
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238815
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1238815
Date:19.11.2003
[2003/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:B41M5/00
[2002/37]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/33]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsmedium und Zeichnungsverfahren[2002/37]
English:Ink jet recording element and printing method[2002/37]
French:Matériau pour l'impression a jet d'encre et procédé d'impression[2002/37]
Examination procedure20.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/09]
14.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.06.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
28.06.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
28.06.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
28.06.2004M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0609930  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0627324  (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6190781  (TSUBAKI MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1002660  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5418078  (DESIE GUIDO [BE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1029702
 US5853965
 US5866282
 US5874205
 US5888643
 US5888681
 US5888683
 US5888714