EP1239200 - Spool valve for controlled dampers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2002/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Troy A. 725 Colony Drive - Appt. B York, PA 17404 / US | 02 /
Kruckemeyer, William C. 2935 Tara Trail Beavercreek, OH 45434 / US | 03 /
Oliver, Michael L. 1315 Smith Road Xenia, OH 45395 / US | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Denton, Michael John Delphi Automotive Systems, Centre Technique Paris, 117, avenue des Nations, B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02075794.4 | 28.02.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | US20010273938P | 07.03.2001 Original published format: US 273938 P | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1239200 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1239200 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/26, F16F9/46, F16F9/50 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
F16K3/265 (EP,US);
F16F9/46 (EP,US);
F16F9/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/37] | F16K3/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2002/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schieberventil für geregelte Dämpfer | [2002/37] | English: | Spool valve for controlled dampers | [2002/37] | French: | Tiroir pour amortisseur contrôlé | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 05.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/28] | 20.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS60220237 ; | [XY]US3409286 (HANS ERDMANN) [X] 1-8,11-14,17,18 * column 2, line 65 - column 6, line 16 * * figures 2,3 * [Y] 16; | [X]EP0538601 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-5,9-15,19,20 * column 1, line 45 - column 5, line 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5454452 (OEHLIN KENTH [SE]) [A] 1,11* abstract *; | [A]US5887621 (DOLL ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1,11 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860326), vol. 010, no. 077, Database accession no. (M - 464), & JP60220237 A 19851102 (KAYABA KOGYO KK) [Y] 16 * abstract * |