Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243182

EP1243182 - Chocolate product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2007
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cake Art b.v.
Vaartweg 4
8861 KV Harlingen / NL
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / van der Heide, Sierk Laurentius Michael
Franekereind 1618
8861 ED Harlingen / NL
 [2002/39]
Application number, filing date02075828.004.03.2002
[2002/39]
Priority number, dateNL2001101766622.03.2001         Original published format: NL 1017666
[2002/39]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1243182
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1243182
Date:28.05.2003
[2003/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1243182
Date:02.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A23G1/00
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
TitleGerman:Schokoladeprodukt[2002/39]
English:Chocolate product[2002/39]
French:Produit du chocolat[2002/39]
Examination procedure04.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/01]
02.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2006Fee for grant paid
12.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.08.2006
CH02.08.2006
CY02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
FR02.08.2006
IT02.08.2006
LI02.08.2006
TR02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
GR03.11.2006
ES13.11.2006
PT02.01.2007
GB04.03.2007
LU04.03.2007
IE05.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT02.08.2006
CH02.08.2006
CY02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
FR02.08.2006
IT02.08.2006
LI02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
GR03.11.2006
ES13.11.2006
PT02.01.2007
GB04.03.2007
LU04.03.2007
IE05.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
Former [2009/01]AT02.08.2006
CH02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
FR02.08.2006
IT02.08.2006
LI02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
GR03.11.2006
ES13.11.2006
PT02.01.2007
GB04.03.2007
IE05.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
Former [2008/20]AT02.08.2006
CH02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
IT02.08.2006
LI02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
GR03.11.2006
ES13.11.2006
PT02.01.2007
GB04.03.2007
IE05.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
Former [2008/10]AT02.08.2006
CH02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
IT02.08.2006
LI02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
ES13.11.2006
PT02.01.2007
IE05.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
Former [2008/09]AT02.08.2006
CH02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
IT02.08.2006
LI02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
ES13.11.2006
PT02.01.2007
MC31.03.2007
Former [2007/38]AT02.08.2006
CH02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
IT02.08.2006
LI02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
ES13.11.2006
PT02.01.2007
Former [2007/27]AT02.08.2006
CH02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
LI02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
ES13.11.2006
PT02.01.2007
Former [2007/23]AT02.08.2006
CH02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
LI02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
ES13.11.2006
Former [2007/22]CH02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
LI02.08.2006
DK02.11.2006
SE02.11.2006
ES13.11.2006
Former [2007/11]CH02.08.2006
FI02.08.2006
LI02.08.2006
SE02.11.2006
ES13.11.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]US3959516  (WARKENTIN BRIAN T) [X] 1-10 * example -; claim 1 *;
 [X]WO9741738  (KRAFT FOODS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 3, paragraph L; example - *;
 [PX]EP1163901  (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * paragraph [0108] *;
 [X]JPH10179034  ;
 [X]JPH07194305  ;
 [E]WO0247488  (MARS INC [US]) [E] 1,2,7 * example - *;
 [A]EP0705890  (VIDEOJET SYSTEMS INT [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0739957  (DOMINO PRINTING SCIENCES PLC [GB]) [A] 1-10 * table 8 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 37, Database accession no. 1998-430842, XP002236708 & JPH10179034 A 19980707 (FUJI SEIYU KK) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07194305 A 19950801 (TANIGUCHI:KK) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract *