EP1261205 - Animation security method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stephany, Thomas Michael Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Squilla, John R. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Olson, Donald Edward Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/48] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02076467.6 | 12.04.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | US20010841411 | 24.04.2001 Original published format: US 841411 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1261205 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1261205 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
H04N7/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/36] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitsverfahren für Animation | [2002/48] | English: | Animation security method | [2002/48] | French: | Méthode de sécurité pour animation | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 31.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |