Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260911

EP1260911 - Internal data structure for applications intended to interface to an HTML or XML type document [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.12.2006
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.01.2007  [2007/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Devillers, Sylvain
Société Civile S.P.I.D., 156, Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)van Oudheusden-Perset, Laure E. , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 44
5656 AE Eindhoven / FR
[N/P]
Former [2006/17]van Oudheusden-Perset, Laure E. , et al
Société Civile SPID 156, Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2004/36]Charpail, François , et al
Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2002/48]de la Fouchardière, Marie-Noelle
Société Civile "SPID" 156, Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date02076520.218.04.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateFR2001000576727.04.2001         Original published format: FR 0105767
[2002/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1260911
Date:27.11.2002
Language:FR
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/21
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
TitleGerman:Interne Datenstruktur einer Schnittstelle zu einem HTML- oder XML-Dokument[2002/48]
English:Internal data structure for applications intended to interface to an HTML or XML type document[2002/48]
French:Structure de données interne pour application destinée à s'interfacer avec une interface pour un document de type HTML ou XML[2002/48]
Examination procedure27.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/31]
24.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/02]
22.08.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US6178432  (COOK WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 38 *
 [A]  - DATABASE INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002186909 [A] 1,2 * abstract *
    [] - ROBIE J., "Using the DOM as an XML/HTML repository API", PROC. SGML/XML EUROPE '98, Paris, France, (19980517), pages 101 - 106, URL: http://www.infoloom.com./gcaconfs/WEB/paris98/robie.HTM, (20020109), XP002209537 [ ] * page 5, line 8 - line 45 *
 [A]  - NENTWICH C ET AL, "BOX: BROWSING OBJECTS IN XML", SOFTWARE PRACTICE & EXPERIENCE, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD. CHICHESTER, GB, (200012), vol. 30, no. 15, ISSN 0038-0644, pages 1661 - 1676, XP000969714 [A] 1,2 * page 1661, line 1 - page 1664, line 31 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-024X(200012)30:15<1661::AID-SPE353>3.0.CO;2-O
 [A]  - KLEIN B, "APPLICATION DEVELOPMENT XML MAKES OBJECT MODELS MORE USEFUL", INFORMATIONWEEK, MANHASSET, NY, US, (19990628), ISSN 8750-6874, pages 1A - 6A, XP002935959 [A] 1,2 * the whole document *