blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1255043 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1255043



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 87
17.11.2005 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
22.07.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
03.06.2005 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
21.04.2005 Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 1
13.09.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.07.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
26.07.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.07.2004 European search report Search / examination 1
25.09.2002 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.04.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.04.2002 Claims Search / examination 5
24.04.2002 Description Search / examination 18
24.04.2002 Drawings Search / examination 5
24.04.2002 Priority document Search / examination 22
24.04.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
24.04.2002 Translation of priority document Search / examination 20