blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1255043


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.11.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  04.01.2006  [2006/01]
16.07.2005 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
01.06.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
15.04.2005 New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit
15.04.2005 New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit
08.04.2005 Definitive list of designations published on  25.05.2005  [2005/21]
23.07.2004 Publication of search report published on  08.09.2004  [2004/37]
16.04.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.09.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.11.2002  [2002/45]