Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255043

EP1255043 - Inertia driven turbine or pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 16.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.01.2006  [2006/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Franch, Gino
Via Col di Lana, 5
39100 Bolzano / IT
[2002/45]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Faraggiana, Vittorio
Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l.
Via Vincenzo Monti 8
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Faraggiana, Vittorio, Dr. Ing.
Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date02076626.724.04.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateIT2001BZ0002430.04.2001         Original published format: IT BZ20010024
[2002/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1255043
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1255043
Date:08.09.2004
[2004/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:F04D33/00, F04F7/00
[2002/45]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2005/21]
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Maschine, begründet auf Rotorträgheitskräften, betrieben als Turbine oder als Pumpe[2002/45]
English:Inertia driven turbine or pump[2002/45]
French:Pompe ou turbine entrainée par l'inertie[2002/45]
Examination procedure09.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/01]
22.07.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.04.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005DE   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005FR   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005GB   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.04.2005M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1094226  (FRANCH GINO [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0964162  (FRANCH GINO [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *