Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256989

EP1256989 - Organic light emitting diode with high contrast ratio [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2008
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2007/46]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kahen, Keith Brian, c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2002/46]Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe , et al
Kodak Limited, Patent Department (W92)-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date02076697.829.04.2002
[2002/46]
Priority number, dateUS2001085302310.05.2001         Original published format: US 853023
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1256989
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1256989
Date:12.10.2005
[2005/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1256989
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/52
[2007/33]
Former International [2002/46]H01L51/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/25]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Organische lichtemittierende Diode mit hohem Kontrastverhältnis[2002/46]
English:Organic light emitting diode with high contrast ratio[2002/46]
French:Diode organique électroluminescente avec rapport de contraste élevé[2002/46]
Examination procedure06.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/18]
24.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2007Fee for grant paid
01.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO0035028  (CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECH [GB], et al) [Y] 1-5 * page 13, paragraph 3 - page 15, paragraph 2; figures 6,7 *;
 [DY]EP0372763  (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA]) [DY] 1-5 * page 3, line 32 - line 46 * * page 4, line 36 - line 38 * * page 5, line 51 - page 6, line 3 *
ExaminationEP0987774
 WO9903158