Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1233144

EP1233144 - Locating and orienting system and use in multilateral wells [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
P.O. Box 819052
Dallas, TX 75381-9052 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/52]For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
P.O. Box 819052 Dallas
Texas 75381-9052 / US
Former [2002/34]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
P.O. Box 819052
Dallas, Texas 75381-9052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Williamson, Jimmie Robert
2307 Statler Drive
Carrolton, TX 75007 / US
02 / Reesing, David Lynn
1304 Rusdell
Irving, TX 75060 / US
03 / Gano, John C.
2015 White Ash Road
Carrollton, TX 75007 / US
 [2002/34]
Representative(s)Curtis, Philip Anthony , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/34]Curtis, Philip Anthony , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date02076706.724.08.1995
[2002/34]
Priority number, dateUS1994029694126.08.1994         Original published format: US 296941
US1995038076830.01.1995         Original published format: US 380768
[2002/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1233144
Date:21.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1233144
Date:04.09.2002
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1233144
Date:28.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:E21B23/02
[2002/34]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB [2003/21]
Former [2002/34]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:System zur Lokalisierung und Orientierung und Einsatz in multilateralen Bohrlöchern[2002/34]
English:Locating and orienting system and use in multilateral wells[2002/34]
French:Système de localisation et d'orientation et son utilisation dans des puits multi-latéraux[2002/34]
Examination procedure27.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
20.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2005Fee for grant paid
09.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95305916.9  / EP0701042
Opposition(s)29.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR28.12.2005
[2009/01]
Documents cited:Search[A]US4364430  (SZARKA) [A] 1,9 * column A * * column 6, line 15 - line 40 *;
 [A]US4369840  (SZARKA) [A] 1,9 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 23 *;
 [A]US4921044  (COOKSEY) [A] 1,9 * column 5, line 22 - line 37 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 8 *;
 [A]US3807498  (TERRAL) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 51 - line 61 * * column 4, line 16 - line 32 *;
 [A]US4510797  (GUIDRY) [A] 1,9 * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 22 *;
 [A]US4614233  (MENARD MILTON) [A] 1,9 * figures 1,4,5,10A; claims 1,2 *