Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1245362

EP1245362 - Method and device for manufacturing brush bodies for tooth brushes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.04.2009
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 30.12.2009  [2009/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boucherie, Bart Gerard
Ambachtenstraat 84
8870 Izegem / BE
[2002/40]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/40]
Representative(s)Donné, Eddy
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv.
Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2002/40]Donné, Eddy
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
Application number, filing date02076899.008.09.1997
[2002/40]
Priority number, dateBE1996000088921.10.1996         Original published format: BE 9600889
[2002/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1245362
Date:02.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1245362
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1245362
Date:04.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/16
[2002/40]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   LI [2004/09]
Former [2002/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Bürstenkörpern für Zahnbürsten[2002/40]
English:Method and device for manufacturing brush bodies for tooth brushes[2002/40]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour fabriquer des corps de brosse pour brosses à dents[2002/40]
Examination procedure19.09.2003Examination requested  [2004/04]
12.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2008Fee for grant paid
18.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97202741.1  / EP0836923
Opposition(s)05.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
09.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
20.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
18.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
24.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT04.06.2008
GB08.09.2008
ES15.09.2008
[2010/01]
Former [2009/39]IT04.06.2008
ES15.09.2008
Former [2008/47]ES15.09.2008
Documents cited:Search[PA]DE19542102  (ZAHORANSKY FORMENBAU GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1,3,8 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 10; figures 2-5 *;
 [A]EP0709173  (BANDAI CO [JP]) [A] 1-4,7 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 9; figures 13,14 *;
 [DA]EP0504571  (BOUCHERIE NV G B [BE]) [DA] 1,3,8 * the whole document *