Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260240

EP1260240 - Device for measuring and controlling a liquid flow. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROELOFS OCTROOIEN EN INVESTERINGEN B.V.
Dammestraat 1
5628 NM Eindhoven / NL
[2002/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Roelofs, Bernardus Johannes Gerardus Maria
Dammestraat 1
5628 NM EIndhoven / NL
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Valkonet, Rutger , et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Valkonet, Rutger , et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Former [2002/48]Valkonet, Rutger , et al
Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date02076920.416.05.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateNL2001101814823.05.2001         Original published format: NL 1018148
[2002/48]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1260240
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1260240
Date:08.01.2003
[2003/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260240
Date:13.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/14, A61M5/168, G01F1/704
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Messung und zur Kontrolle von Flüssigkeitsfluss[2002/48]
English:Device for measuring and controlling a liquid flow.[2002/48]
French:Dispositif de mesure et de contrôle de débit[2002/48]
Examination procedure05.06.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/32]
03.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2005Fee for grant paid
01.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200403   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
FR13.04.2005
IT13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
CY16.05.2005
IE16.05.2005
LU16.05.2005
MC31.05.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
SE13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
DE01.12.2005
[2008/52]
Former [2008/45]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
IT13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
CY16.05.2005
IE16.05.2005
LU16.05.2005
FR31.05.2005
MC31.05.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
SE13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
DE01.12.2005
Former [2007/38]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
IT13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
CY16.05.2005
IE16.05.2005
LU16.05.2005
MC31.05.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
SE13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
DE01.12.2005
Former [2007/27]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
CY16.05.2005
IE16.05.2005
LU16.05.2005
MC31.05.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
SE13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
DE01.12.2005
Former [2007/26]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
CY16.05.2005
IE16.05.2005
LU16.05.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
SE13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
DE01.12.2005
Former [2007/20]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
CY16.05.2005
IE16.05.2005
LU13.06.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
SE13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
DE01.12.2005
Former [2007/11]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
IE16.05.2005
LU13.06.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
SE13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
DE01.12.2005
Former [2006/52]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
IE16.05.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
SE13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
DE01.12.2005
Former [2006/35]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
IE16.05.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
SE13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
DE01.12.2005
Former [2006/25]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
IE16.05.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
SE13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
Former [2006/14]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
CH13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
LI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
GR13.07.2005
SE13.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
PT13.09.2005
Former [2006/13]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
DK13.07.2005
SE13.07.2005
Former [2005/52]FI13.04.2005
SE13.07.2005
Former [2005/50]SE13.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0120098  (AMERICAN HOSPITAL SUPPLY CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * column A * * page 2, line 22 - page 4, line 15 * * page 7, line 30 - page 10, line 20; figures 1-11 *;
 [XA]EP0105989  (BESPAK INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]) [X] 8-10,14,15 * page 2, line 8 - line 19 * * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 3 * * page 7, line 14 - line 16 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 11,16;
 [X]US3066853  (EUGEN LANDENBERGER) [X] 17 * column 2, line 13 - line 61 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US3329390  (HULSEY ELDON E) [A] 8 * column 3, line 22 - line 27 * * column 4, line 9 - line 17 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]FR2767874  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 17 * page 12, line 10 - line 14 * * page 14, line 17 - page 15, line 7 * * figures 1,2,6,7 *;
 [A]DE19600667  (KLOPP RAINER L M DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 17 * column 3, line 7 - line 35 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US3826137  (CLARKE E);
 [A]US4432761  (DAWE GARFIELD A [US])