Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239160

EP1239160 - Screw machine and shaft bearing lubrication [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.04.2005  [2005/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ATLAS COPCO AIRPOWER N.V.
Boomsesteenweg 957
2610 Wilrijk / BE
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / De Bock, Richard André Maria
Molenhoekstraat 48
9170 Sint-Gillis-Waas / BE
 [2004/29]
Former [2002/37]01 / De Boek, Richard Andrè Maria
Molenhoekstraat 48
9170 Sint-Gillis-Waas / BE
Representative(s)Donné, Eddy
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv.
Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Donné, Eddy
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
Application number, filing date02077412.118.12.1997
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateBE1996000107723.12.1996         Original published format: BE 9601077
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1239160
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1239160
Date:27.11.2002
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:F04C29/02, F04C18/16
[2002/48]
Former International [2002/37]F04C18/16, F04C29/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2002/37]
TitleGerman:Schraubenmaschine und Wellenlagerschmierung[2004/28]
English:Screw machine and shaft bearing lubrication[2002/37]
French:Machine à vis et lubrification de paliers d'arbre[2004/28]
Former [2002/37]Spiralmaschine und Lagerschmierung
Former [2002/37]Machine à vis et lubrification de paliers
Examination procedure07.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/17]
04.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.2004Fee for grant paid
14.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/16]
18.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97204001.8  / EP0851126
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2127490  (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * page 2, line 126 - page 3, line 23; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]EP0154673  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 1 - line 8; figures 4,9 *