blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1284407

EP1284407 - Fireworks device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 27.12.2006  [2006/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jakob Hatteland Kjemi AS
Amsosen
5578 Nedre Vats / NO
[2003/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Hatteland, Jakob
5578 Nedre Vats / NO
 [2003/08]
Representative(s)Crosby, Wendy Agnes
Fitzpatricks
1 Blythswood Square
Glasgow G2 4AD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/08]Henderson, Wendy Agnes
Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street
Glasgow G2 1RS / GB
Application number, filing date02078815.416.11.2000
[2003/08]
Priority number, dateNO1999000570219.11.1999         Original published format: NO 995702
[2003/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1284407
Date:19.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1284407
Date:02.04.2003
[2003/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1284407
Date:05.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2003
ClassificationIPC:G09F13/46, F42B4/00, F42B4/06, F42B12/36
[2003/14]
CPC:
G09F13/46 (EP,US); F42B4/04 (KR)
Former IPC [2003/08]F42B4/06, F42B12/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/08]
Extension statesAL11.10.2002
LT11.10.2002
LV11.10.2002
MK11.10.2002
RO11.10.2002
SI11.10.2002
TitleGerman:Feuerwerkvorrichtung[2003/08]
English:Fireworks device[2003/08]
French:Feu d'artifice[2003/08]
Examination procedure11.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/08]
09.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2004Fee for grant paid
30.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00978119.6  / EP1234156
Opposition(s)06.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.01.2005
BE05.01.2005
CH05.01.2005
LI05.01.2005
TR05.01.2005
GR05.04.2005
[2006/52]
Former [2006/14]AT05.01.2005
BE05.01.2005
CH05.01.2005
LI05.01.2005
GR05.04.2005
Former [2006/12]AT05.01.2005
BE05.01.2005
CH05.01.2005
LI05.01.2005
Former [2005/51]AT05.01.2005
BE05.01.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US4706568  (LUNDWALL NEAL M [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4934273  (ENDRIZ JOHN G [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US5102131  (REMINGTON BRUCE [US]);
 [AD]US5339741  (CRAVEN B THOMAS [US], et al)
by applicantUS5102131
 US5339741
 US5425542
 US5725445
 US5917146
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.