Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321810

EP1321810 - Stabilized black-and-white developing compositions and methods of use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Schwartz, Paul Andrew, c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Flavin, Susan Mary, c/o Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date02079440.024.10.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateUS2001000089302.11.2001         Original published format: US 893
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1321810
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1321810
Date:16.07.2003
[2003/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:G03C5/305
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/15]
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Stabilisierte Schwarz-Weiss-Entwicklungszusammensetzungen und Verwendungsmethoden[2003/26]
English:Stabilized black-and-white developing compositions and methods of use[2003/26]
French:Compositions développatrices pour la photographie en noir et blanc stabilisées et méthodes d'utilisation[2003/26]
Examination procedure10.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/06]
06.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/43]
25.05.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[DXA]US5702875  (OPITZ ROBERT JOHN [US], et al) [DX] 1-6,8,9 * examples 3 and 6 * [A] 7,10;
 [XA]EP0777150  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [X] 1-6,8,9 * developer TAD-S on page 76 * [A] 7,10;
 [XA]EP0774687  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [X] 1-6,8,9 * see developer D-S on page 41 * [A] 7,10;
 [A]JP2000292890  ;
 [A]EP0603586  (ILFORD LTD [GB]) [A] 1-6,8,9 * see claim 1; page 3, lines 48-51 and examples 1-2 *;
 [A]US5824458  (OKUTSU EIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6,8,9 * see claim 1; developer A in columns 20-21 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000292890 A 20001020 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract *