Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317071

EP1317071 - Normalisation in a turbo decoder using the two's complement format [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/23]Turbo decoder extrinsic normalization
[2008/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
7839 Churchill Way
Mail Station 3999
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/10]For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wolf, Tod D.
1321 Alto
Richardson, TX Texas 75081 / US
02 / Mondragon-Torres, Antonio F.
4000 E. Renner Rd., No. 1925
Richardson, TX Texas 75082 / US
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Holt, Michael , et al
Texas Instruments Limited
European Patent Department
3rd Floor
401 Grafton Gate
Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Holt, Michael , et al
Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive
Northampton NN4 7YL / GB
Former [2003/35]Holt, Michael , et al
Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department PO Box 5069
Northampton, NN4 7ZE / GB
Former [2003/23]Holt, Michael
Texas Instruments Ltd., EPD MS/13, 800 Pavilion Drive
Northampton Business Park, Northampton NN4 7YL / GB
Application number, filing date02079501.926.09.2002
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateUS20010325404P26.09.2001         Original published format: US 325404 P
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1317071
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1317071
Date:02.06.2004
[2004/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317071
Date:04.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:H03M13/39, H03M13/45, // H03M13/29
[2008/41]
Former International [2003/23]H03M13/29
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/08]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Normalisierung in einem Turbo-Dekoder bei Verwendung des Zweierkomplements[2008/41]
English:Normalisation in a turbo decoder using the two's complement format[2008/41]
French:Normalisation pour un turbo-décodeur utilisant le complément à deux[2008/41]
Former [2003/23]Äussere Turbodekoder Normalisierung
Former [2003/23]Turbo decoder extrinsic normalization
Former [2003/23]Normalisation extrinsèque d'un turbo décodeur
Examination procedure02.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/06]
17.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2009Fee for grant paid
07.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.12.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06]
Request for further processing for:21.05.2007Request for further processing filed
21.05.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.06.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]  WORM A ET AL, "Advanced implementation issues of turbo-decoders", PROC. 2ND INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON TURBO CODES AND RELATED TOPICS, BREST, FRANCE, (20000904), pages 351 - 354, XP009028944 [A] 1-7 * page 352 *
 [A]  WU Y ET AL, "INTERNAL DATA WIDTH IN SISO DECODING MODULE WITH MODULAR RENORMALIZATION", PROC. OF IEEE 51ST VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, TOKYO, JAPAN, (20000515), vol. 1 OF 3. CONF. 51, ISBN 0-7803-5719-1, pages 675 - 679, XP000970706 [A] 1-7 * page 676 - page 678 *
 [A]  MASERA G ET AL, "VLSI architectures for turbo codes", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VERY LARGE SCALE INTEGRATION (VLSI) SYSTEMS, (199909), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 1063-8210, pages 369 - 379, XP002187339 [A] 1-7 * page 372 * * page 374 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/92.784098
 [A]  HEKSTRA A P, "AN ALTERNATIVE TO METRIC RESCALING IN VITERBI DECODERS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (19891101), vol. 37, no. 11, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 1220 - 1222, XP000074542 [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1221 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.46516
 [A]  BERNARD SHUNG C ET AL, "VLSI ARCHITECTURES FOR METRIC NORMALIZATION IN THE VITERBI ALGORITHM", PROC. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, ATLANTA, USA, (19900415), vol. 4, pages 1723 - 1728, XP000146072 [A] 1-7 * page 1726 - page 1727 *