blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1424362

EP1424362 - Process for preparing a composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.09.2005  [2005/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2004/23]For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Muscat, Dirk
Maretzstraat 5
6171 TN Stein / NL
02 / Stanssens, Dirk Armand Wim
De Huttestraat 93
3530 Houthalen / BE
03 / Heise, Andreas
Gangulistraat 7
52538 Gangelt / DE
04 / Dorschu, Marko
Ecrivissestraat 9
6191 CH Beek / NL
 [2004/23]
Representative(s)Mooij, Johannes Jacobus, et al
DSM Intellectual Property
Office Geleen
P.O. Box 9
6160 MA Geleen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2004/23]Mooij, Johannes Jacobus, et al
DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9
6160 MA Geleen / NL
Application number, filing date02079933.427.11.2002
[2004/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1424362
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2003
ClassificationIPC:C08L77/12, C08F2/44, C09D177/12
[2004/23]
CPC:
C08J11/06 (EP); C08J3/226 (EP); C09D177/12 (EP);
C08J2323/02 (EP); C08J2477/00 (EP); C08K3/013 (EP);
C08K3/04 (EP); C08K3/34 (EP); C08K3/346 (EP);
C08L77/12 (EP); Y02W30/62 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
C09D177/12, C08L2666/72 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2005/08]
Former [2004/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Zusammensetzung[2004/23]
English:Process for preparing a composition[2004/23]
French:Procédé de préparation d'une composition[2004/23]
Examination procedure23.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/36]
04.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.01.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005BG   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005CZ   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005DE   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005EE   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005FR   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005GB   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005SK   M01   Not yet paid
12.01.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
12.01.2005M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4789403  (RICE CAMILLA A [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 28; example -; claim - *;
 [Y]EP0358415  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 4, line 4 - page 8, line 38; example -; claim - *;
 [Y]EP0605005  (UNITIKA LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, line 51 - page 5, line 34 *;
 [YX]WO9916810  (DSM NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 17, line 19 - page 29, line 9; examples V-VIII; claim - * [X] 11-16;
 [YX]EP1038902  (DSM NV [NL]) [Y] 1-10 * page 12, line 21 - page 13, line 19; claim - * [X] 11-16;
 [YX]WO0056804  (DSM NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 18, line 9 - page 20, line 35; example II * [X] 11-16;
 [Y]US6255378  (FUJIMOTO KOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 8 - column 6, line 23 * * column 7, line 37 - column 10, line 17; example -; claim - *;
 [YX]WO02064888  (EDMUNDS JOHN MICHAEL [GB]) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, lines 4-6 * * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 11 * * page 4, line 27 - page 14, line 11 * * page 15, line 1 - page 16, line 6 * [X] 11-16;
 [YX]  - MUSCAT D ET AL, "HYPERBRANCHED POLYESTERAMIDES - NEW DENDRITIC POLYMERS", TOPICS IN CURRENT CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (2001), vol. 212, ISSN 0340-1022, pages 41 - 80, XP001068479 [Y] 1-10 * page 63, paragraph 5 - page 78, paragraph 7 * [X] 11-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-44924-8_2
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.