Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319979

EP1319979 - Imaging materials containing peptoid substituted azole couplers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.03.2006
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Diehl, Donald Richard, Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Nigel, Robert J., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
03 / Dunlap, Richard P., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
04 / Sonnefeld, William J., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
05 / Schmitthenner, Hans F., Eastman Kodak Company
Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited
Patent Department (W160-G)
Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex
HA1 4TY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Application number, filing date02079970.628.11.2002
[2003/25]
Priority number, dateUS2001002112712.12.2001         Original published format: US 21127
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1319979
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:G03C7/32, G03C1/12
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/11]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bildaufzeichnungselemente beinhaltend peptoidsubstituierte Azolkuppler[2003/25]
English:Imaging materials containing peptoid substituted azole couplers[2003/25]
French:Elément formateur d'image contentant un copulant azole-cyclique subsitué avec un groupe peptoide[2003/25]
Examination procedure14.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/03]
20.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/19]
07.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DX]US5925503  (HARDER JOHN W [US], et al) [DX] 1,4 * column 11 - column 12; figure M19 *