Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317957

EP1317957 - Zinc-substituted zeolite adsorbents and processes for the use thereof in gas separation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC.
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Stephenson, Neil Andrew
68 South Castlerock Lane
East Amherst, New York 14051 / US
02 / Hou, Qisheng
18 Redspire Way
East Amherst, New York 14051 / US
03 / Guliants, Vadim
9146 Nottingham Way
Mason, Ohio / US
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto , et al
Elzaburu S.L.P.
Miguel Angel, 21
28010 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto , et al
Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21
28010 Madrid / ES
Former [2003/24]Elzaburu, Alberto de , et al
Elzaburu S.A. Miguel Angel, 21
28010 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date02080028.002.12.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateUS2001099814103.12.2001         Original published format: US 998141
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317957
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:B01J20/18
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesES,   IT [2004/10]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Zink-substituiertes Zeolith-Adsorbens und Verfahren zu dessen Verwendung zur Trennung von Gasen[2003/24]
English:Zinc-substituted zeolite adsorbents and processes for the use thereof in gas separation[2003/24]
French:Adsorbant zéolitique substitué par le zinc et procédé pour son utilisation dans la séparation de gaz[2003/24]
Examination procedure30.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/39]
26.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/28]
09.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/28]
Documents cited:Search[DX]EP0895966  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [DX] 1-3,5-10 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0031]; examples 3B,5B,6B; claims 1,5,11,12 *;
 [DX]EP0476901  (CROSFIELD JOSEPH & SONS [GB]) [DX] 1-3,5,7-10 * page 14, line 12 - line 28; example 3 *;
 [X]US6117411  (TAKEWAKI TAKAHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * column 19, line 18 - line 20; example 26; claims 1,3,5 *;
 [X]US5648558  (HATANO MASAKATSU [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * examples C-2-2,C-2-4 *;
 [DA]US5562756  (COE CHARLES G [US], et al)