Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321702

EP1321702 - Reinforced permeation-proof plastic pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pipelife Nederland B.V.
P.O. Box 380
1600 AJ Enkhuizen / NL
[2003/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Van Dam., Joris Willy Adrie
Hertog Albrechtstraat 48
1611 GN Bovenkarspel / NL
02 / Dalmolen, Lambertus Gerrit Peter
Javakade 562
1019 SE Amsterdam / NL
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2003/26]van Westenbrugge, André , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date02080477.920.12.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateNL2001101962720.12.2001         Original published format: NL 1019627
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1321702
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:F16L9/12
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/26]
TitleGerman:Verstärktes, undurchlässiges Kunststoffrohr[2003/26]
English:Reinforced permeation-proof plastic pipe[2003/26]
French:Tuyau en matière plastique imperméable renforcé[2003/26]
Examination procedure18.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
16.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/49]
04.07.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE4235825  (CONTROLS ENGINEERING CA AG ROR [CH]) [X] 1,2 * figure -; claim 1 * [A] 7,9;
 [X]EP1054202  (DAYCO EUROPE SRL [IT]) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * page 2, line 21 - line 23; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB1171122  (POST OFFICE [GB]) [A] 1,2,7,9 * figure .; claims 1,9 *;
 [A]EP0638749  (VICTAULIC PLC [GB]) [A] 1,6 * claim 13 *