Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239492

EP1239492 - Memory cell, nonvolatile memory device and control method therefor, improving reliability at low power supply voltage [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2005
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 19.09.2007  [2007/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miwa, Tohru
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Toyoshima, Hideo
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Wenzel & Kalkoff
Patentanwälte
Meiendorfer Strasse 89
22145 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff
Grubesallee 26
22143 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date02090098.106.03.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateJP2001006381207.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001063812
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1239492
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1239492
Date:15.01.2003
[2003/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1239492
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:G11C14/00
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2003/40]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Speicherzelle, nichtflüchtige Speicheranordnung und Steuerungsverfahren dafür, Zulässigkeitsverbesserung bei niedriger Speisespannung[2002/37]
English:Memory cell, nonvolatile memory device and control method therefor, improving reliability at low power supply voltage[2002/37]
French:Cellule de mémoire, dispositif de mémoire non volatile et sa méthode de commande. amélioration de fiabilité à une tension d'alimentation basse[2002/37]
Examination procedure10.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/16]
28.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2004Fee for grant paid
22.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR22.12.2004
IT22.12.2004
[2007/38]
Former [2006/32]FR22.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[DX]JPH0917965  (HITACHI LTD) [DX] 4,15-18,28,33 * entire document *;
 [A]US5978252  (MIWA TOHRU [JP]) [A] 1-5,11,15,17,30-34 * column 3, lines 23-47; figure 8 *