Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238858

EP1238858 - Drive for a vehicle rear view mirror [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.08.2005
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Magna Auteca AG
Elin-Süd-Strasse 14
8160 Weiz / AT
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Schillegger, Peter
Schemerlhöhe 19
8302 Nestelbach / AT
02 / Schadler, Bernhard
Sinabelkirchen 115/5
8261 Sinabelkirchen / AT
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
Former [2002/37]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date02090101.308.03.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateDE200111235908.03.2001         Original published format: DE 10112359
[2002/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238858
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1238858
Date:30.06.2004
[2004/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:B60R1/074, B60R1/076
[2004/27]
Former International [2002/37]B60R1/074
Designated contracting states[2005/12]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Antrieb für den Rückspiegel eines Kraftfahrzeuges[2002/37]
English:Drive for a vehicle rear view mirror[2002/37]
French:Dispositif de commande pour un rétroviseur de véhicule[2002/37]
Examination procedure31.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/39]
26.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.02.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005DE   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005FR   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005GB   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
07.02.2005M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5867328  (STAPP ARMIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-7,10-12 * column 8, line 22 - line 40; figure 11 *;
 [X]JPS62131843  ;
 [A]EP0931699  (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]DE9321326U  (MURAKAMI KAIMEIDO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 8 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871118), vol. 0113, no. 52, Database accession no. (M - 643), [X] 1 * abstract *