EP1261212 - Method and apparatus for coding and decoding image data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monolith Co., Ltd. 1-7-3, Azabu-juban, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Monolith Co., Ltd. 1-7-3, Azabu-juban, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akiyoshi, Kozo 1-7-3, Azabu-juban, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0045 / JP | 02 /
Akiyoshi, Nobuo 1-7-3, Azabu-juban, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0045 / JP | 03 /
Shinagawa, Yoshihisa c/o Monolith Co., Ltd 1-7-3 Azabu-Juban, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0045 / JP | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02090152.6 | 23.04.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | JP20010125579 | 24.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001125579 | JP20010152166 | 22.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001152166 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1261212 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1261212 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/36, H04N7/46, H04N7/50, H04N7/32 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
H04N19/577 (EP,US);
H04N19/114 (EP,US);
H04N19/177 (EP,US);
H04N19/33 (EP,US);
H04N19/50 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (EP,US);
H04N19/523 (EP,US);
H04N19/53 (EP,US);
H04N19/54 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/48] | H04N7/36, H04N7/32 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/37] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bilddatenkodierung und -Dekodierung | [2002/48] | English: | Method and apparatus for coding and decoding image data | [2002/48] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de codage et décodage d'images vidéo | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/12] | 15.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2004/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.07.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.07.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.07.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5455629 (SUN HUIFANG [US], et al) [X] 30,31 * column 1, line 44 - line 61; figure 1 * * column 2, line 33 - line 64; figure 2 * [A] 1-29; | [DY]US6018592 (SHINAGAWA YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [DY] 2,10,11 * the whole document *; | [XAY] - JAIN J R ET AL, "DISPLACEMENT MEASUREMENT AND ITS APPLICATION IN INTERFRAME IMAGE CODING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19811201), vol. 29, no. 12, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 1799 - 1808, XP000601714 [X] 1,3-9,12-18 * paragraph [Effect of Displacement on Temporal Correlation]; page 1802 * * paragraph [Frame Skipping]; page 1803; figure 6 * [A] 19-31 [Y] 2,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1981.1094950 | [XA] - "ITU-T RECOMMENDATION H.262, INTERNATIONAL STANDARD ISO/IEC 13818.2 MPEG-2 VIDEO. TRANSMISSION OF NON-TELEPHONE SIGNALS. INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - GENERIC CODING OF MOVING PICTURES AND ASSOCIATED AUDIO INFORMATION: VIDEO", ITU-T TELECOMMUNICATION STANDARIZATION SECTOR OF ITU, GENEVA, CH, (19950701), pages 1 - 211, XP000198491 [X] 19-29 * paragraph [4.1.1]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0007]; figures 7-1 * * paragraph [7.6.2.2]; figures 7-11 * [A] 1-18,30,31 | [XA] - TUDOR P N, "TUTORIAL MPEG-2 VIDEO COMPRESSION", ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERING JOURNAL, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, LONDON, GB, (19951201), vol. 7, no. 6, ISSN 0954-0695, pages 257 - 264, XP000545121 [X] 30,31 * paragraph [Picture types] *;; figure 3 * [A] 1-29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ecej:19950606 | [A] - ELY S R, "MPEG VIDEO. A SIMPLE INTRODUCTION", EBU REVIEW- TECHNICAL, EUROPEAN BROADCASTING UNION. BRUSSELS, BE, (19951221), no. 266, ISSN 0251-0936, pages 12 - 23, XP000559446 [A] 1-31 * paragraph [03.6] * | [A] - NEWÇGLOWSKI J ET AL, "MOTION COMPENSATED VIDEO SEQUENCE INTERPOLATION USING DIGITAL IMAGEWARPING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP). I. IMAGE AND MULTIDIMENSIONAL SIGNAL PROCESSING. ADELAIDE, APR. 19 - 22, 1994, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19940419), vol. 5 CONF. 19, ISBN 0-7803-1776-9, pages V - 205-V-208, XP000522474 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * | [A] - TANG C-W ET AL, "UNIDIRECTIONAL MOTION COMPENSATED TEMPORAL INTERPOLATION", ISCAS '97. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS. CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS IN THE INFORMATION AGE. HONG KONG, JUNE 9 - 12, 1997, IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, NEW-YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (19970609), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-3584-8, pages 1444 - 1447, XP000832479 [A] 1-31 * paragraph [02.2] * | [A] - FRANCOIS E ET AL, "CODING ALGORITHM WITH REGION-BASED MOTION COMPENSATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19970201), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 97 - 108, XP000678883 [A] 1-31 * paragraph [0III] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.554421 |