Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238706

EP1238706 - Cassette-stack with cassettes for histological examinations [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leica Microsystems Nussloch GmbH
Heidelberger Strasse 17-19
69226 Nussloch b. Heidelberg / DE
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / LAUDAT, Andreas
Im Zeitersgrund 2
74909, Meckesheim / DE
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Reichert, Werner Franz
Leica Microsystems GmbH
Corporate Patents and Trademarks
Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37
35578 Wetzlar / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Reichert, Werner F., Dr.
Leica Microsystems AG, Corporate Patents + Trademarks Department, Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37
35578 Wetzlar / DE
Application number, filing date02100157.320.02.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateDE2001204158U09.03.2001         Original published format: DE 20104158 U
[2002/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238706
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1238706
Date:26.11.2003
[2003/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238706
Date:22.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:B01L9/00, B65H1/06
[2003/48]
Former International [2002/37]B01L9/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
TitleGerman:Kassettenstapel mit Kassetten für histologische Untersuchungen[2002/37]
English:Cassette-stack with cassettes for histological examinations[2002/37]
French:Pile de cassettes avec cassettes pour examens histologiques[2002/37]
Examination procedure17.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/12]
01.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2004Fee for grant paid
02.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
IT22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
TR22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
CY20.02.2005
LU20.02.2005
PT22.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/38]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
IT22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
TR22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
CY20.02.2005
LU20.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2007/20]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
TR22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
CY20.02.2005
LU20.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2007/11]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
TR22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
LU20.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/52]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
TR22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
BE28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/14]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
BE28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/13]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
BE28.02.2005
Former [2005/46]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI22.09.2004
IE22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/18]FI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI22.09.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE22.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]US6098839  (HUNNELL JACK E [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 43 - column 8, line 33; figures 1,5-9,17 * * column 7, lines 6-21 *;
 [A]GB2235163  (LAMB PAULINE DIANA [GB]) [A] 1-10 * pages 1-4; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5511690  (CALHOUN JEFFREY E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 54 *;
 [A]US5445296  (INSAUSTI JOSE L P [ES], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 17 - column 3, line 37 *;
 [A]US4343579  (SHELTON LAWRENCE S, et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *