Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237337

EP1237337 - Efficient optimization algorithm in memory utilization for network applications [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2006
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.02.2006  [2006/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Broadcom Corporation
16215 Alton Parkway, P.O. Box 57013
Irvine, CA 92619-7013 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Broadcom Corporation
16215 Alton Parkway, P.O. Box 57013
Irvine, California 92619-7013 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ni, Shih-Hsiung
3041 Fowler Road
San Jose, CA 95135 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Jehle, Volker Armin
Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/22]Jehle, Volker Armin
Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Former [2002/36]Lind, Robert , et al
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date02100217.504.03.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateUS2001027234102.03.2001         Original published format: US 272341
US2002008207726.02.2002         Original published format: US 82077
[2002/44]
Former [2002/36]US2001027234102.03.2001
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1237337
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1237337
Date:12.11.2003
[2003/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1237337
Date:02.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/20
[2003/46]
Former International [2002/36]H04L12/56, H04L29/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/32]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Effizienter Optimierungsalgorithmus für Speichergebrauch in Netzwerkanwendungen[2002/36]
English:Efficient optimization algorithm in memory utilization for network applications[2002/36]
French:Un algorithme efficace pour l'optimisation de l'utilisation de la mémoire dans des applications réseau[2002/36]
Examination procedure20.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
22.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2004Fee for grant paid
27.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US5717394  (SCHWARTZ EDWARD L [US], et al) [X] 1-56 * figures 9,10,14A,16B * * column 20, lines 43-50 * * column 21, lines 25-38 * * column 25, lines 16-37 * * column 40, lines 1-14 *;
 [X]US5832289  (SHAW VENSON M [US], et al) [X] 1-56 * column 6, lines 44-67 * * column 9, lines 45-67 * * column 22, lines 60-67 * * column 23, lines 1-23 *;
 [A]US6104696  (KADAMBI SHIRI [US], et al) [A] 1-56 * column 13, lines 11-67 * * column 14, lines 1-13 * * column 29, lines 49-67 * * column 30, lines 1-4 *