Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254633

EP1254633 - Computer tomograph [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - applicantpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/47]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2005/52]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2003/20]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2002/45]For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:FR  GB 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Grass, Michael, Dr.
c/o Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH W
52066, Aachen / DE
02 / Köhler, Thomas, Dr.
c/o Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH W
52066, Aachen / DE
03 / Proksa, Roland
c/o Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH W
52066, Aachen / DE
 [2005/52]
Former [2002/45]01 / Grass, Michael
c/o Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH W
52066, Aachen / DE
02 / Köhler, Thomas
c/o Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH W
52066, Aachen / DE
03 / Proksa, Roland
c/o Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH W
52066, Aachen / DE
Representative(s)Volmer, Georg , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Volmer, Georg , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
Former [2002/45]Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Weisshausstrasse 2
52066 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date02100427.030.04.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateDE200112144102.05.2001         Original published format: DE 10121441
[2002/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1254633
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1254633
Date:25.06.2003
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1254633
Date:28.12.2005
Language:DE
[2005/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/03, G06T11/00
[2003/26]
Former International [2002/45]A61B6/03
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/12]
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Computertomograph[2002/45]
English:Computer tomograph[2002/45]
French:Tomographe assisté par ordinateur[2002/45]
Examination procedure29.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
20.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2005Fee for grant paid
31.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR28.12.2005
[2008/52]
Former [2008/40]FR30.04.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0981995  (PHILIPS CORP INTELLECTUAL PTY [DE], et al) [A] 1,5 * column W *;
 [A]EP0969414  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] * page 2, line 21 - line 43 *;
 [A]US5974110  (HU HUI [US]);
 [A]  BESSON G, "NEW CLASSES OF HELICAL WEIGHTING ALGORITHM WITH APPLICATIONS TO FAST CT RECONSTRUCTION", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (199808), vol. 25, no. 8, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 1521 - 1532, XP000848574

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.598327
by applicantWO9936885