Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1263246

EP1263246 - Method for automatic programmation and corresponding components [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dittmann, Werner
Berg 46
83544 Albaching / DE
 [2002/49]
Application number, filing date02100449.406.05.2002
[2002/49]
Priority number, dateDE200112623930.05.2001         Original published format: DE 10126239
[2002/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1263246
Date:04.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1263246
Date:14.04.2004
[2004/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1263246
Date:09.08.2006
Language:DE
[2006/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04Q3/00
[2002/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB [2005/01]
Former [2002/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum automatischen Programmieren sowie zugehörige Komponenten[2002/49]
English:Method for automatic programmation and corresponding components[2002/49]
French:Méthode pour la programmation automatique et les composants correspondants[2002/49]
Examination procedure22.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/21]
15.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2006Fee for grant paid
19.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI09.08.2006
[2007/11]
Documents cited:Search[A]US5381548  (MATSUO AKIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-13 * column A * * column 3, line 1 - line 34 *
 [X]  MILLER J A ET AL, "Component-based simulation environments: JSIM as a case study using Java Beans", SIMULATION CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, 1998. WINTER WASHINGTON, DC, USA 13-16 DEC. 1998, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19981213), ISBN 0-7803-5133-9, pages 373 - 381, XP010319703 [X] 1,12,13 * page 375, paragraph 3.6 * * page 375, paragraph 4 * * page 376, paragraph 4.1 * * page 378, paragraph 6.2 - paragraph 6.3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WSC.1998.745011