blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1306036

EP1306036 - A checkout-conveyor divider [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2006
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bay Media Limited
48 Portland Place
London W1B 1AJ / GB
[2003/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Schottlander, Mark
6 Roseanne House Etchingham Park Road Finchley
London, Hertfordshire N3 2UJ / GB
 [2003/18]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses, et al
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]Messulam, Alec Moses, et al
A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 43-45 High Road
Bushey Heath, Bushey, Herts WD23 1EE / GB
Application number, filing date02102003.704.07.2002
[2003/18]
Priority number, dateGB2001002587229.10.2001         Original published format: GB 0125872
[2003/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1306036
Date:02.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1306036
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2002
ClassificationIPC:A47F9/02, G09F1/06
[2003/18]
CPC:
G09F1/06 (EP,US); A47F9/04 (EP,US); G09F23/06 (EP,US);
A47F2009/041 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/04]
Former [2003/18]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Teiler für Kassensystem Förderband[2003/18]
English:A checkout-conveyor divider[2003/18]
French:Separateur de caisses de sortie[2003/18]
Examination procedure06.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/26]
18.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2005Fee for grant paid
23.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.12.2003M01   Fee paid on   22.12.2003
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200403   M06   Fee paid on   03.08.2004
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR28.09.2005
IT28.09.2005
DE29.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2007/38]IT28.09.2005
DE29.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
Former [2006/36]DE29.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
Former [2006/33]ES08.01.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]US2449911  (ROTH LOUIS H) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 34 - column 3, line 36; figure - *;
 [A]US4534126  (GILMAN HARRY [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 1 - column 2, line 65 *;
 [A]US5450926  (FRASER WILLIAM A [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]DE29714687U  (LIEDTKE JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2330680  (KESSLERS INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *;
 [A]FR2784781  (BENSIMON RENAUD [FR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.