Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1422599

EP1422599 - Method and user interface for entering characters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2007
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2004/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Tokkonen, Timo
Siionintie 29
90800, Oulu / FI
 [2004/22]
Representative(s)Antila, Harri Jukka Tapani , et al
Kolster Oy Ab
Elektroniikkatie 8
90590 Oulu / FI
[N/P]
Former [2005/42]Antila, Harri Jukka Tapani , et al
Kolster Oy Ab, P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [2004/22]Antila, Harri Jukka Tapani
Kolster Oy Ab, P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date02102606.720.11.2002
[2004/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1422599
Date:26.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1422599
Date:05.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/023, G06F3/033
[2004/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/22]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Benutzerschnittstelle zur Zeicheneingabe[2004/22]
English:Method and user interface for entering characters[2004/22]
French:Méthode et interface utilisateur de saisie de caractères[2004/22]
Examination procedure01.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/45]
05.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
25.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2006Fee for grant paid
17.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.07.2006
BE05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
CY05.07.2006
CZ05.07.2006
EE05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
SK05.07.2006
TR05.07.2006
BG05.10.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
GR06.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
IE20.11.2006
LU20.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
PT05.12.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]AT05.07.2006
BE05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
CZ05.07.2006
EE05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
SK05.07.2006
TR05.07.2006
BG05.10.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
GR06.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
IE20.11.2006
LU20.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2008/28]AT05.07.2006
BE05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
CZ05.07.2006
EE05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
SK05.07.2006
BG05.10.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
GR06.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
IE20.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2008/20]AT05.07.2006
BE05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
CZ05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
SK05.07.2006
BG05.10.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
GR06.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
IE20.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/48]AT05.07.2006
BE05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
CZ05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
SK05.07.2006
BG05.10.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
IE20.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/38]AT05.07.2006
BE05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
CZ05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
SK05.07.2006
BG05.10.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
MC30.11.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/28]AT05.07.2006
BE05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
CZ05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
SK05.07.2006
BG05.10.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/23]AT05.07.2006
CH05.07.2006
CZ05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
BG05.10.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/22]CH05.07.2006
CZ05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
BG05.10.2006
DK05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/12]CH05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
BG05.10.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
PT05.12.2006
Former [2007/11]CH05.07.2006
LI05.07.2006
SE05.10.2006
ES16.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9927435  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,11,12,15,16 * page 4, line 8 - line 29; figure 1 * * page 6, line 1 - line 24; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]US6337698  (KEELY JR LEROY BERTRAND [US], et al) [A] 1-7,11-17 * column 6, line 24 - column 7, line 35; figures 10,11 *;
 [A]US5805167  (VAN CRUYNINGEN IZAK [US]) [A] 1,3-7,10,11,13-17 * abstract * * column 12, line 18 - line 29; figure 9 *