EP1322061 - Low-power packet detection using decimated correlation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/06] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | ||
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williams, Richard 12939 Brome Way San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 02 /
Golanbari, Michael 1645 Saint Frances Road Santa Rosa, CA 95409 / US | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2003/30] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department PO Box 5069 Northampton, NN4 7ZE / GB | ||
Former [2003/26] | Holt, Michael, et al Texas Instruments Ltd., EPD MS/13, 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton Business Park, Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02102810.5 | 18.12.2002 | [2003/26] | Priority number, date | US20010026319 | 20.12.2001 Original published format: US 26319 | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1322061 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1322061 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1322061 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/02, H04L7/04, H04B1/16 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
H04W52/029 (EP,US);
H04L7/0054 (EP,US);
H04L7/042 (EP,US);
H04W52/0225 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2003/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Packeterkennung mit dezimierter Korrelation bei niedrigem Leistungsverbrauch | [2003/26] | English: | Low-power packet detection using decimated correlation | [2003/26] | French: | Détection de pacquet par correlation décimée | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 25.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/03] | Request for further processing for: | 22.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.2007 | Decision despatched | 31.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.04.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5373536 (DEHNER JR LEO G [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8 * column 2, line 57 - column 5, line 29 *; | [X]US5727032 (JAMAL KARIM [SE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,8 * column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 22 * * column 14, line 48 - column 15, line 11 * * figures 4,9 *; | [X]US6310896 (LANGBERG EHUD [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 45 *; | [PX]WO02076010 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [PX] 1,3-8 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 19 - page 7, paragraph 39 *; | [A] - SHARK L-K ET AL, ADAPTIVE FRAME SYNCHRONISER FOR DIGITAL SATELLITE COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, IEE PROCEEDINGS F. COMMUNICATIONS, RADAR & SIGNAL PROCESSING, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS. STEVENAGE, GB, VOL. 135, NR. 1, PAGE(S) 51-59, ISSN 0956-375X, XP000670504 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * Section 1. Introduction * * Section 2. Basic frame synchroniser concept * |