Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1221710

EP1221710 - Method of manufacturing triode carbon nanotube field emitter array [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.2005
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.10.2005  [2005/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.
575, Shin-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city
Kyungki-do / KR
[N/P]
Former [2004/44]For all designated states
Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.
575, Shin-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR
Former [2002/28]For all designated states
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
575, Sin-Dong, Paldal-Ku
Suwon-Si, Kyungki-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Chung, Deuk-seok, 241-804 Hwanggol Ssangyong Apt.
1052-2 Youngtong-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR
02 / Kim, Jong-min, 641-1802 Shinnamushil Shinwon Apt.
965-2 Youngtong-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR
03 / Park, Shang-hyeun
4-110 Heunghwa Apt. 503-17 Daecheon 2-dong
Boryung-city, Chungcheongnam-do / KR
04 / Lee, Nae-sung
2-1305 Siyoung Apt. 450 Seongsan-dong
Mapo-gu, Seoul / KR
05 / Lee, Hang-woo
516-102 Jugong Apt. 964-5 Youngtong-dong
Paldal-gu, Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR
 [2004/19]
Former [2002/28]01 / Chung, Deuk-seok, 241-804 Hwanggol Ssangyong Apt.
1052-2 Youngtong-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR
02 / Kim, Jong-min, 641-1802 Shinnamushil Shinwon Apt.
965-2 Youngtong-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR
03 / Park, Shang-hyeun
4-110 Heunghwa Apt. 503-17 Daccheon 2-dong
Boryung-city, Chungcheongnam-do / KR
04 / Lee, Nae-sung
2-1305 Siyoung Apt. 450 Seongsan-dong
Mapo-gu, Seoul / KR
05 / Lee, Hang-woo
516-102 Jugong Apt. 964-5 Youngtong-dong
Paldal-gu, Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR
Representative(s)Greene, Simon Kenneth , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/28]Greene, Simon Kenneth , et al
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date02250035.904.01.2002
[2002/28]
Priority number, dateKR2001000068005.01.2001         Original published format: KR 2001000680
KR2001008335322.12.2001         Original published format: KR 2001083353
[2002/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1221710
Date:10.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1221710
Date:27.11.2002
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1221710
Date:27.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01J9/02
[2002/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2003/33]
Former [2002/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Kohlenstoffnanoröhren-Feldemissionsanordnung mit Triodenstruktur[2002/28]
English:Method of manufacturing triode carbon nanotube field emitter array[2002/28]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un réseau à émission de champ à structure triode utilisant des nanotubes de carbone[2002/28]
Examination procedure19.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/16]
24.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2004Fee for grant paid
18.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US6097138  (NAKAMOTO MASAYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-21 * column 4 - column 12; figures 5A-C,8A-D *;
 [AD]US5973444  (XU XUEPING [US], et al) [AD] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [PA]JP2001143601  ;
 [A]JP2000348601  (SONY CORP) [A] 10 * Computer translation of Jap. Patent Office;; figures 5,8 *;
 [PA]US2001025962  (NAKAMOTO MASAYUKI [JP]) [PA] 10 * page 3 - page 7; figures 6-9 *
 [PA]  - CHUNG D S ET AL, "Field emission display using self-aligned carbon nanotube field emitters", DATABASE INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, Database accession no. 7145723, XP002207999 [PA] 1-21 * the whole document *
    [] - IVMC 2001. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 14TH INTERNATIONAL VACUUM MICROELECTRONICS CONFERENCE (CAT. NO.01TH8586), PROCEEDINGS OF THE 14TH INTERNATIONAL VACUUM MICROELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, DAVIS, CA, USA, 12-16 AUG. 2001, 2001, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-7197-6, pages 179 - 180, XP002214627
 [A]  - CHOI W B ET AL, "LATE-NEWS PAPER: A 4.5-IN. FULLY SEALED CARBON NANOTUBE-BASED FIELD-EMISSION FLAT-PANEL DISPLAY", 1999 SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. SAN JOSE, CA, MAY 18 - 20, 1999, SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS, SAN JOSE, CA: SID, US, (19990518), vol. 30, pages 1134 - 1137, XP000894834 [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, [PA] 10 * abstract *