Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1326196

EP1326196 - Fingerprint sensing smart card with on-card fingerprint comparison [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2007
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAGNEX CORPORATION
6284-A San Ignacio Ave. San Jose
California 95119 / US
[2006/12]
Former [2003/28]For all designated states
Magnex Corporation
6284-A San Ignacio Ave.
San Jose, California 95119 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lin, Fong-Jei
19450 Via Madronas Court
Saratoga, California 95070 / US
02 / Zhu, Shengbo
1072 Minrou Drive
San Jose, California 95120 / US
 [2003/28]
Representative(s)Frost, Alex John , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/28]Frost, Alex John , et al
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date02250039.104.01.2002
[2003/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1326196
Date:09.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1326196
Date:22.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, G06K19/10, G07F7/10, G07C9/00, G06K7/00
[2003/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/28]
TitleGerman:Chipkarte mit Fingerabdrucksensor und -erkennung[2003/28]
English:Fingerprint sensing smart card with on-card fingerprint comparison[2003/28]
French:Carte à puce avec saisie et reconnaissance d'empreintes digitales[2003/28]
Examination procedure08.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/12]
25.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
01.12.2005Fee for grant paid
01.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11]
Request for further processing for:01.12.2005Request for further processing filed
01.12.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.12.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
17.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
18.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.03.2006
BE22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
CY22.03.2006
FI22.03.2006
FR22.03.2006
IT22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
TR22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
DE23.06.2006
GR23.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT22.03.2006
BE22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
CY22.03.2006
FI22.03.2006
FR22.03.2006
IT22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
DE23.06.2006
GR23.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2009/01]AT22.03.2006
BE22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
FI22.03.2006
FR22.03.2006
IT22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
DE23.06.2006
GR23.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2008/29]AT22.03.2006
BE22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
FI22.03.2006
IT22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
DE23.06.2006
GR23.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2008/20]AT22.03.2006
BE22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
IT22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
DE23.06.2006
GR23.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2007/38]AT22.03.2006
BE22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
IT22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
DE23.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2007/14]AT22.03.2006
BE22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
DE23.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2007/13]AT22.03.2006
BE22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2007/11]AT22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
DK22.06.2006
SE22.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
PT22.08.2006
Former [2006/50]AT22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
SE22.06.2006
ES03.07.2006
Former [2006/45]AT22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
NL22.03.2006
SE22.06.2006
Former [2006/43]AT22.03.2006
CH22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
Former [2006/42]CH22.03.2006
LI22.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0994439  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0020] - [0022] - [0026] - [0029] - [0036] , [0037] * [Y] 5-7;
 [XY]DE19648767  (SIEMENS AG OESTERREICH [AT]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - line 52 * * column 2, line 45 - line 50 * [Y] 5-7;
 [X]DE19618144  (ZIEGLER HANS BERNDT DR [DE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 31 *;
 [X]US6325285  (BARATELLI PAUL J [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 5, line 13 - line 42 *